Epperson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Crystal S. Epperson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA General Counsel
Case Number: 1:2020cv00369
Filed: December 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1383
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #4 thru #6: (1) Advising attorney that the Complaint should not have been scanned in with the summons or attached as an exhibit; and (2) Document #2 should not have been printed and used as the first page of the summons returned executed. When the issued summonses were emailed to attorney, an extra copy of the first page only for each summons should have been printed to use. Attorney is not required to re-file. (RLW)
December 23, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed in Social Security Case by Crystal S. Epperson. Service made upon: U S Attorney General; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit USPS tracking form)(Thomas, Ashley)
December 23, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed in Social Security Case by Crystal S. Epperson. Service made upon: Commissioner of SSA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit USPS tracking form)(Thomas, Ashley)
December 23, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed in Social Security Case by Crystal S. Epperson. Commissioner of Social Security served on 12/21/2020, answer due 3/22/2021. Service made upon: U S Attorney; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit USPS tracking form)(Thomas, Ashley)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER requiring answer and briefing. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 12/11/20 (HM)
December 9, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (wld)
December 9, 2020 Emailed issued summons to plaintiff's attorney at email on docket. (wld)
December 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0538-4433086), filed by Crystal S. Epperson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(wld)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Epperson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal S. Epperson
Represented By: Ashley Brooke Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?