Crosby v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kamila Crosby
Defendant: BP America Production Company, Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc., Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., Transocean Holdings LLC, Transocean Deepwater, Inc. and BP Exploration & Production Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00104
Filed: April 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Referring Judge: Robert P Myers
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 104. Attorney is advised that BP America Production Co. is named as BP America Production Company in the body of the Amended Complaint. The complete case number for this case is 1:21cv104 LG-RPM. Also, individual defendants should be selected when picking the parties that this filing is against, not "All Defendants". Scanned document contains blank page. PDF documents should be checked for errors before filing. Attorney is directed to re-file and make all of these corrections prior to re-filing. This document will be disregarded on the docket. (JCH)
May 12, 2021 Filing 18 **DISREGARD**AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kamila Crosby.(Harris, Terris) Modified on 5/13/2021 (JCH).
April 30, 2021 Pro Hac Vice fee paid by Charles David Durkee $ 100, receipt number 14643013231 (JCH)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Street's admission will NOT be deemed complete until the Court receives payment of the pro hac vice admission fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr. on April 29, 2021. (JC)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. DUrkee's admission will NOT be deemed complete until the Court receives payment of the pro hac vice admission fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr. on April 29, 2021. (JC)
April 29, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 13. 1.) Attorney is advised that there is only 1 plaintiff in this case, therefore "all plaintiffs" should not be selected as a filer, only the individual plaintiff. 2.) The correct case number and judge assignment for this case is 1:21cv104 LG-RPM, which should be listed on all future filings. DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 14. The correct judge assignment for this case is LG-RPM, which should be reflected on all future filings. DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 15. The case number listed on this document is incorrect. The correct case # is 1:21cv104 LG-RPM, which should be listed on all future filings. (JCH)
April 28, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Matthew Street to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kamila Crosby (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Certificate of Good Standing)(Harris, Terris)
April 28, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for David Durkee to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kamila Crosby (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Certificate of Good Standing)(Harris, Terris)
April 28, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Terris C. Harris on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Harris, Terris)
April 2, 2021 Filing 12 Letter sent to Charles David Durkee on 4/2/2021 requesting PHV motion, proposed order and fee. (PKS)
April 2, 2021 Filing 11 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-03330. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 1, 2021 Filing 10 Joint Omnibus Designation of Record for the B3 Cases. (Attachments: #1 Appendix) (lag) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/2/2021.]
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Severing and Transferring cases in the B3 Pleading Bundle to Other Districts pursuant to 28 USC 1404(a) as set forth in document; Case transferred to Southern District of Mississippi. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 4/1/2021. (Originally filed in 10md2179, doc. 27018)(lag) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/2/2021.]
January 4, 2021 Filing 8 Statement by Kamila Crosby PTO 66 (Durkee, Charles) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/2/2021.]
January 4, 2021 Filing 7 Statement by Kamila Crosby PTO 63 (Durkee, Charles) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/2/2021.]
December 9, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc., Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., Transocean Deepwater, Inc., Transocean Holdings, LLC, Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/2/2021.]
December 9, 2020 Filing 5 Request of Summons Issued as to BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc., Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., Transocean Deepwater, Inc., Transocean Holdings, LLC, Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc. filed by Kamila Crosby re #1 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Summons SUMMONS IN A CIVIL ACTION, #2 Summons SUMMONS IN A CIVIL ACTION, #3 Summons SUMMONS IN A CIVIL ACTION, #4 Summons SUMMONS IN A CIVIL ACTION, #5 Summons SUMMONS IN A CIVIL ACTION)(Durkee, Charles) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/2/2021.]
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Regarding Filing Requests for Summons and Summons Returns; ORDERED that requests for summons shall be filed in the docket for the member case, as opposed to the master docket. FURTHER ORDERED that summons returns shall not be filed into any docket, master or member, unless filing the summons return becomes necessary (for example, in connection with a motion for default judgment). When it is necessary to file a summons return, the attorney shall avoid filing the summons return as a separate, stand-alone document in the master docket. Instead, the summons return shall be filed as an exhibit to the motion, etc., to which it relates. (Doc #10204 in 10-md-2179). Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 05/20/2013. (gec) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/2/2021.]
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRETRIAL ORDERS #1, #11, #12 1st Amended, #25, #31, #41 2nd Amended, #68, #68 1st Amended. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier. (Attachments: #1 PTO 11, #2 PTO 12 1st Amended, #3 PTO 25, #4 PTO 31, #5 PTO 41 2nd Amended, #6 PTO 68, #7 PTO 68 1st Amended)(gec) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/2/2021.]
December 7, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (go) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/2/2021.]
December 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8629050) filed by Kamila Crosby. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Charles David Durkee added to party Kamila Crosby(pty:pla).(Durkee, Charles) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/2/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crosby v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP America Production Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transocean Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transocean Deepwater, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Exploration & Production Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kamila Crosby
Represented By: Charles David Durkee
Represented By: Terris C. Harris
Represented By: Charles David Durkee - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?