Underwood et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Heather K. Stiles and Laura Underwood
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2021cv00145
Filed: April 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Taylor B McNeel
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Laura Underwood. United States of America served on 5/27/2021, answer due 7/26/2021. (Owen, Joe)
May 18, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (JCH)
April 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America (Filing fee $ 402; receipt number 0538-4543254), filed by Laura Underwood, Heather K. Stiles. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JCH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Underwood et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather K. Stiles
Represented By: Joe Sam Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Underwood
Represented By: Joe Sam Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?