Griffin v. Lil Daddy Pizza, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Rasheed Griffin
Defendant: Matthew Magee, Lil Daddy Pizza, LLC and Big Daddy Pizza, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00195
Filed: June 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Additional Consent by Rasheed Griffin (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Smith Consent Form)(Ryan, William)
July 1, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Big Daddy Pizza, LLC. (JCH)
July 1, 2021 Summons to be issued received via email and issued summons returned via email. (JCH)
June 30, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Additional Consents by Rasheed Griffin (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Brewer and Spencer Consent Forms)(Ryan, William)
June 30, 2021 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Lil Daddy Pizza, LLC, Matthew Magee, Big Daddy Pizza, LLC, filed by Rasheed Griffin. (Attachments: #1 Summons Big Daddy Pizza, LLC)(Ryan, William) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/30/2021) (JCH).
June 30, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 3-1. 1.) Attorney is advised that proposed summons should not be attached to the Amended Complaint, but sent to the Clerk's Office for issuance. Also, the named defendant is Big Daddy Pizza, LLC and should be named as such on the summons sent to the Clerk's Office. 2.) Any PDF fillable on-line forms once completed should be electronically converted to PDF by printing to the PDF printer. Save the file with an appropriate name in a folder. E-file the electronically converted PDF form, not the form which was filled in and saved. Clerk's Office has replaced the form so it is no longer fillable. (JCH)
June 8, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Lil Daddy Pizza, LLC, Matthew Magee. (JCH)
June 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lil Daddy Pizza, LLC, Matthew Magee (Filing fee $ 402; receipt number 0538-4572361), filed by Rasheed Griffin. Jury trial requested by Plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - R. Griffin Consent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(JCH)
June 8, 2021 Issued summons mailed to attorney to address listed on docket/summons. (JCH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffin v. Lil Daddy Pizza, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rasheed Griffin
Represented By: William Benjamin Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Magee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lil Daddy Pizza, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Daddy Pizza, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?