Button et al v. Alford et al
Plaintiff: Alice Button and Steve Strausbaugh
Defendant: Kim Alford, Sam Smith, Alan Lumpkin and PRC School District
Case Number: 1:2021cv00308
Filed: September 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Halil S Ozerden
2 Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 REPLY to #13 Response in Opposition to #11 MOTION for Second Preliminary Injunction filed by Alice Button, Steve Strausbaugh (PKS)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying Defendants' #3 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice, with leave to reassert, and granting Plaintiffs Leave to Amend Complaint. Plaintiffs must file any Amended Complaint on or before December 8, 2021. Signed by District Judge Halil S. Ozerden on 11/17/2021. (lg)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Supplement to #9 (Reply) Response to Motion to Dismiss by Alice Button, Steve Strausbaugh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Letter from Dr. Stacy Baudoin, #2 Copy of Motion for Second Preliminary Injunction filed 10/26/2021, #3 Envelope)(PKS)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REPLY to #12 Response in Opposition to #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Alice Button, Steve Strausbaugh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Letter from Dr. Stacy Baudoin, #2 Envelope)(PKS) Modified on 11/19/2021 to correct linkage to #12 Response and #8 Motion.
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION for Second Preliminary Injunction filed by Kim Alford, Alan Lumpkin, PRC School District, Sam Smith (Lloyd, Erica)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Kim Alford, Alan Lumpkin, PRC School District, Sam Smith (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Folder, #2 Exhibit Handbook, #3 Exhibit Handbook)(Lloyd, Erica)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER staying proceedings. A Motion to Dismiss #3 raising an immunity defense has been filed. Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 16(b)(3)(B), the attorney conference, disclosure requirements, and all discovery are stayed, pending the Courts ruling on the Motion #3 . NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE FROM THIS COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H Walker on 11/2/21 (TS)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #12: L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2) requires that all supporting exhibits to a document be denominated by an exhibit letter or number and a meaningful description (The exhibit number should have also been included in the description box). Attorney is advised to follow this rule in future filings. (RLW)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Second Preliminary Injunction by Alice Button, Steve Strausbaugh (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JCH)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Kim Alford, Alan Lumpkin, PRC School District, Sam Smith (Lloyd, Erica)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CORRECTED RESPONSE (Reply) to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Alice Button and Steve Strausbaugh. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(PKS)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Alice Button and Steve Strausbaugh. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(PKS)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RESPONSE (Reply) to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Alice Button and Steve Strausbaugh. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(PKS)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 State Court Record by Defendants Kim Alford, Alan Lumpkin, PRC School District, Sam Smith (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Summons PRC School District, #4 Summons Alan Lumpkin, #5 Summons Sam Smith, #6 Summons Kim Alford, #7 Clerk's Letter to Plaintiffs, #8 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Lloyd, Erica)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Kim Alford, Alan Lumpkin, PRC School District, Sam Smith (Lloyd, Erica)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Kim Alford, Alan Lumpkin, PRC School District, Sam Smith (Lloyd, Erica)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss by Kim Alford, Alan Lumpkin, PRC School District, Sam Smith (Lloyd, Erica)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III on 10/1/2021 (VM)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Remark: Parties should include the newly assigned Magistrate Judge's initials RHWR on future filings. (VM)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kim Alford, Alan Lumpkin, PRC School District, Sam Smith from Pearl River County Circuit Court, case number C021cv143. Lower court jury demand. (Filing fee $ 402; receipt number 4667115) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 - State Court Complaint, #2 - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Notice of Assignment)(JCH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Button et al v. Alford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Button
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Strausbaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Alford
Represented By: Erica Jo Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Smith
Represented By: Erica Jo Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Lumpkin
Represented By: Erica Jo Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRC School District
Represented By: Erica Jo Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?