Brit UW Limited v. Atwood Properties, LLC
Plaintiff: Brit UW Limited
Defendant: Atwood Properties, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00313
Filed: October 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brit UW Limited. Atwood Properties, LLC served on 11/29/2021, answer due 12/20/2021. (Johnson, Whitman)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Richard E. Zelonka, Jr.; granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Paul Jeffery Rowe, Jr. That Attorneys Richard E. Zelonka, Jr. and Paul Jeffery Rowe, Jr. be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Plaintiff in association with local counsel conditioned upon completion of the registration procedures found on the Court's website and at the following link: https://www.mssd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-page. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H Walker on 10/13/2021 (AB)
October 12, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Paul Jeffery Rowe, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AMSSDC-4679080) by Brit UW Limited (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing from State Bar of Georgia)(Johnson, Whitman)
October 12, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Richard E. Zelonka, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AMSSDC-4679079) by Brit UW Limited (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing from State Bar of Georgia, #2 Certificate of Good Standing from The Florida Bar)(Johnson, Whitman)
October 8, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Lorraine Walters Boykin on behalf of Brit UW Limited (Boykin, Lorraine)
October 6, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Atwood Properties, LLC. (JCH)
October 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Atwood Properties, LLC (Filing fee $ 402; receipt number 675530), filed by Brit UW Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy redacted, #2 Exhibit B - Late Reported Claims, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(JCH)
October 6, 2021 Issued summons mailed to attorney to address listed on docket/summons. (JCH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brit UW Limited v. Atwood Properties, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brit UW Limited
Represented By: Whitman B. Johnson, III
Represented By: Lorraine Walters Boykin
Represented By: Richard Edward Zelonka - PHV, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atwood Properties, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?