Caranna et al v. Gebrueder Knauf Verwaltungsgesellschaft KG et al
Plaintiff: Mary Sue Caranna, George Ferry, Stephanie Fussell, Jack Green, Nancy Lafontaine, Larry Lafontaine, Billy McCullar, Susan Cain, Mark Lee, Wade Gauthreaux, Sheryl Gauthreaux, David Fozard, Candace Fozard, George Humphries, The Van Tran, Chin Thi Nguyen, David Martino, Brittany Martino, Carlisle Place LLC, Arrowhead Lodge LLC, Richard Calevro, Michael M. Christovich, Mary Ann Ferry, Wanda Green, George W. Humphries, III, George W. Humphries, IV, Renee Lee, Andree McCullar and Christopher Payton
Defendant: Gebrueder Knauf Verwaltungsgesellschaft KG, Knauf International GmbH, Knauf Insulation GmbH, Knauf UK GmbH, Knauf AMF GmbH & Co KG, Knauf DO Brasil LTD, PT Knauf Gypsum Indonesia, Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co., Ltd., Knauf Plasterboard (Wuhu) Co., Ltd. and Guangdong Knauf New Building Material Products Co Ltd
Case Number: 1:2021cv00314
Filed: October 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2021 Filing 28 Letter sent to Attorneys Doyle, Sr., Dodson, Dysart and Miller on 10/7/21 requesting PHV motion, proposed order and fee. (RLW)
October 7, 2021 Filing 27 Case transferred in from District of Alabama Northern; Case Number 5:14-cv-02204. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER - The Court severs and transfers certain plaintiffs, as listed in the order, to the FLSD, ALSD, FLMD, MSSD, and TXSD, DISMISSES plaintiffs, A. DSouza, B. Desjardins, N. Khan, A. Kjos, and R. Swanson, and orders plaintiffs counsel to file a fifth amended complaint within 21 days from the entry date of this order, as more fully set in order; original electronic record will be uploaded to the Clerks of Court where the parties are being transferred to within 10 business days from this date. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 9/22/2021. (AHI) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 10/7/2021.]
September 21, 2021 Filing 25 RESPONSE to re #23 Order filed by Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dodson, Michael) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 10/7/2021.]
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER - Due to damage caused by Hurricane Ida, the Court extends the deadline for the parties to submit the proposed order referenced in the 30 Order issued on 8/30/2021 from 9/7/2021 until 9/21/2021. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 9/1/2021. (AHI) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 10/7/2021.]
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER - The parties are to submit an updated proposed order by 9/7/2021 which clearly and explicitly states which plaintiffs' cases are to be severed, which court those plaintiffs' cases are to be transferred to and which plaintiffs' cases are to be retained, as more fully set out in order. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 8/30/2021. (AHI) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 10/7/2021.]
June 4, 2021 Filing 22 Amended MOTION Entry of Proposed Order by Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Amended Motion for Entry of Proposed Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A to Proposed Order)(Dodson, Michael) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 10/7/2021.]
May 5, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION For Entry of Proposed Order by Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Dodson, Michael) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 10/7/2021.]
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 4/26/2021. (KBW) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 10/7/2021.]
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 4/26/2021. (KBW) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 10/7/2021.]
April 21, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Liles C Burke: Telephone Conference held on 4/21/2021; James Doyle present for plaintiffs; Michael Dodson and Kerry Miller present for defendants; Parties discussed current posture of the case. Parties to submit a proposed order for severance and transfer not later than May 5, 2021. (SPT ) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 10/7/2021.]
April 21, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Kerry James Miller by Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dodson, Michael) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 10/7/2021.]
April 21, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Daniel John Dysart by Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dodson, Michael) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 10/7/2021.]
April 21, 2021 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-382336 (B460112798). (Dodson, Michael) Modified on 4/22/2021 (AHI). [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 10/7/2021.]
April 21, 2021 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3823378 (B4601112799). (Dodson, Michael) Modified on 4/22/2021 (AHI). [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 10/7/2021.]
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER that a Telephone Conference is set for Wednesday, 4/21/2021, at 2:30 p.m. CST; dial in information will be emailed to counsel. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 4/19/21. (SPT ) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 10/7/2021.]
April 15, 2021 Filing 15 STATUS REPORT Report of Mediator - Mediation was Unsuccessful by Brad Wash. filed by Brad Wash (Wash, R) Modified on 4/15/2021 (AHI). [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 10/7/2021.]
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time. For good cause shown, the deadline for the parties to conduct mediation is hereby extended to April 21, 2021. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 3/15/2021. (KBW) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 10/7/2021.]
March 12, 2021 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time by Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co Ltd. (Dodson, Michael) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 10/7/2021.]
February 22, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R Dodson on behalf of Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co Ltd (Dodson, Michael) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 10/7/2021.]
February 11, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by James Victor Doyle, Sr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Doyle, James) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 10/7/2021.]
February 4, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Liles C Burke: Telephone Conference held on 2/4/2021; James Doyle, Jr. present for plaintiff; The Court conducted a telephone conference in this matter on February 4, 2021. As discussed during the conference, the parties hereby ordered to mediate this case within 45 days. The parties are further ordered to file a joint status report on or before March 22, 2021, regarding the results of the mediation. (Court Reporter Lindy Fuller.) (SPT ) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 10/7/2021.]
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The Court conducted a telephone conference in this matter on February 4, 2021. As discussed during the conference, the parties hereby ORDERED to mediate this case within 45 days. The parties are further ORDERED to file a joint status report on or before March 22, 2021, regarding the results of the mediation. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 2/4/21. (BJL) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 10/7/2021.]
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER that a Telephone Conference is set for 2/4/2021 at 10:45 a.m.; dial in information will be emailed to counsel. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 2/01/21. (SPT ) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 10/7/2021.]
January 6, 2021 Filing 8 DOCKET SHEET for Eastern District of Louisiana (2:14-cv-02722-EEF-MBN). (KEK) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 10/7/2021.]
January 6, 2021 Filing 7 CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER from Eastern District of Louisiana (2:14-cv-02722-EEF-MBN). (KEK) (KEK, ). [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 10/7/2021.]
January 6, 2021 Filing 6 Case reassigned to Judge Liles C Burke. Judge Inge P Johnson no longer assigned to the case. (KEK) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 10/7/2021.]
December 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Transferring Case to MDL: CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-30) of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of Eastern District of Louisiana for inclusion in MDL 2047 In re: Chinese-Manufactured Drywall Products Liability Litigation; certified copy of docket entries and documents electronically sent to transferee clerk in Eastern District of Louisiana. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Eldon E. Fallon. (CTS, )12/8/14. [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 10/7/2021.]
November 17, 2014 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Knauf Insulation GmbH. Delivered via certified mail. (PSM) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 10/7/2021.]
November 14, 2014 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by Luciana Bado, Elizabeth Bennett, Jennifer Brady, CDO Investments LLC, Mary Sue Caranna, Damian Cason, Mardechria Charles, Bonnie Cordier, Ajesh D'Souza, Bill Desjardins, George Ferry, Stephanie Fussell, Michael Ginart, Jack Green, Tim Hoffman, Ike Ijemere, Jeremy Jordan, Noor Khan, Ashley Kjos, Paul J Kleinmann, MCF Enterprises Inc, Toni Macksey, Karen McCann, Mindy Milam, Ronald Pendelton, Peter Robinson, Jason Scott, Rusty Swanson, Laura Veira, Jinxi Zhu. (Doyle, James) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 10/7/2021.]
November 14, 2014 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT (PSM) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 10/7/2021.]
November 14, 2014 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-2286113 (NDAL Receipt No. B460105755). related document #1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Elizabeth Bennett. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(PSM). (Doyle, James) Modified on 11/14/2014 (PSM). [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 10/7/2021.]
November 13, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Elizabeth Bennett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(PSM) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 10/7/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caranna et al v. Gebrueder Knauf Verwaltungsgesellschaft KG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Sue Caranna
Represented By: James V. Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Ferry
Represented By: James V. Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Fussell
Represented By: James V. Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Green
Represented By: James V. Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Lafontaine
Represented By: James V. Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Lafontaine
Represented By: James V. Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy McCullar
Represented By: James V. Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Cain
Represented By: James V. Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Lee
Represented By: James V. Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wade Gauthreaux
Represented By: James V. Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheryl Gauthreaux
Represented By: James V. Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Fozard
Represented By: James V. Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candace Fozard
Represented By: James V. Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Humphries
Represented By: James V. Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Van Tran
Represented By: James V. Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chin Thi Nguyen
Represented By: James V. Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Martino
Represented By: James V. Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Martino
Represented By: James V. Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlisle Place LLC
Represented By: James V. Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arrowhead Lodge LLC
Represented By: James V. Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Calevro
Represented By: James V. Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael M. Christovich
Represented By: James V. Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Ann Ferry
Represented By: James V. Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Green
Represented By: James V. Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George W. Humphries, III
Represented By: James V. Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George W. Humphries, IV
Represented By: James V. Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Lee
Represented By: James V. Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andree McCullar
Represented By: James V. Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Payton
Represented By: James V. Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gebrueder Knauf Verwaltungsgesellschaft KG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knauf International GmbH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knauf Insulation GmbH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knauf UK GmbH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knauf AMF GmbH & Co KG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knauf DO Brasil LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PT Knauf Gypsum Indonesia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knauf Gips KG
Represented By: Michael R Dodson
Represented By: Daniel John Dysart
Represented By: Kerry James Miller
Represented By: Daniel John Dysart - PHV
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller - PHV
Represented By: Michael Ryan Dodson - PHV
Represented By: Alysson Leigh Mills
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Michael R Dodson
Represented By: Daniel John Dysart
Represented By: Kerry James Miller
Represented By: Michael Ryan Dodson - PHV
Represented By: Alysson Leigh Mills
Represented By: Daniel John Dysart - PHV
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller - PHV
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knauf Plasterboard (Wuhu) Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guangdong Knauf New Building Material Products Co Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?