United States of America v. Cain et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Harold T. Cain, Ted, Julie P. Cain, HTC Enterprises, LLC, HTC Elite, L.P., Evan Trace Cain GST Trust, Logan Patrick Cain GST Trust and Lucinda K. Sloan
Case Number: 1:2022cv00011
Filed: January 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Taylor B McNeel
Referring Judge: Robert P Myers
2 Judge: Robert H Walker
3 Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgment (Insurance)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2022 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss , #13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Ex. 1-Defs Mot to Dismiss in Aldridge)(Williams-Federal Gov, Angela)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Henry T. Wingate for all further proceedings. District Judge Halil S. Ozerden no longer assigned to case. Parties should include the new judge initials HTW-RHWR on all future filings. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III on 3/7/22. (JCH)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #12 Motion to Reassign Case. Signed by District Judge Halil S. Ozerden on March 4, 2022. (ENW)
March 3, 2022 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION to Reassign Case filed by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Defs. Mot. to Dismiss in Aldridge, #2 Exhibit 2 - Judgment)(Williams-Federal Gov, Angela)
March 3, 2022 Filing 18 ATTACHMENT re #17 Notice (Other) Ex 1 - 400 N Beach Blvd Sale pending FILING by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 - ECF 409 JUDGMENT - FILING_, #2 Exhibit 3 -Hrg Set in Case FOR FILING 1_16-cv-00369-HTW-LGI Aldridge v. Corporate Management Inc. et al Set_Reset Hearings)(England-Federal Gov, Elspeth)
March 3, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Sale and Related Hearing by United States of America (England-Federal Gov, Elspeth)
March 2, 2022 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Reassign Case filed by Harold T. Cain, Julie P. Cain, HTC Elite, L.P., HTC Enterprises, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Response in Opposition to Motion to Reassign)(Musgrove, David)
March 2, 2022 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Reassign Case filed by Evan Trace Cain GST Trust, Logan Patrick Cain GST Trust, Lucinda K. Sloan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Internal Rule 1)(Banahan, John)
February 28, 2022 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Harold T. Cain, Julie P. Cain, HTC Elite, L.P., HTC Enterprises, LLC (Musgrove, David)
February 28, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss by Harold T. Cain, Julie P. Cain, HTC Elite, L.P., HTC Enterprises, LLC (Musgrove, David)
February 28, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Reassign Case by United States of America (Williams-Federal Gov, Angela)
February 28, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Moore on behalf of Evan Trace Cain GST Trust, Logan Patrick Cain GST Trust, Lucinda K. Sloan (Moore, Michael)
February 28, 2022 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Evan Trace Cain GST Trust, Logan Patrick Cain GST Trust, Lucinda K. Sloan (Banahan, John)
February 28, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by Evan Trace Cain GST Trust, Logan Patrick Cain GST Trust, Lucinda K. Sloan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Notice of Appeal, #2 Exhibit B Aldridge Complaint, #3 Exhibit C FCA Case Docket Entry, #4 Exhibit D Aldridge Case Docket Entry, #5 Exhibit E Aldridge Case CMO)(Banahan, John)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Taylor B. McNeel recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Halil S. Ozerden for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Taylor B. McNeel on 2/15/22. Parties should include the newly assigned judges HSO-RHWR on future filings.(JCH)
February 10, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Evan Trace Cain GST Trust served on 2/8/2022, answer due 3/1/2022; Logan Patrick Cain GST Trust served on 2/8/2022, answer due 3/1/2022; Lucinda K. Sloan served on 2/8/2022, answer due 3/1/2022. (wld)
February 10, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed: Harold T. Cain served on 2/9/2022, answer due 3/2/2022; Julie P. Cain served on 2/9/2022, answer due 3/2/2022; HTC Elite, L.P. served on 2/9/2022, answer due 3/2/2022; HTC Enterprises, LLC served on 2/9/2022, answer due 3/2/2022. (JCH)
January 20, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Harold T. Cain, Julie P. Cain, Evan Trace Cain GST Trust, HTC Elite, L.P., HTC Enterprises, LLC, Logan Patrick Cain GST Trust, Lucinda K. Sloan. (JCH)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Robert H Walker for all further proceedings. Attorney's should include the newly assigned judge initials of TBM-RHWR on all future filings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on 1/19/22. (JCH)
January 19, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Albert Thomas Morris-Federal Gov on behalf of United States of America (Morris-Federal Gov, Albert)
January 18, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Angela Givens Williams-Federal Gov on behalf of United States of America (Williams-Federal Gov, Angela)
January 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Harold T. Cain, Julie P. Cain, Evan Trace Cain GST Trust, HTC Elite, L.P., HTC Enterprises, LLC, Logan Patrick Cain GST Trust, Lucinda K. Sloan, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Exhibit 273-2012 Active Corporations and LLC's wholly owned by Ted Cain, #2 Exhibit B - Ds Entity Diagram, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(JCH)
January 18, 2022 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 1. L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2) requires that all supporting exhibits to a document be denominated by an exhibit letter or number and a meaningful description. Attorney is advised that all exhibits be labeled with a letter/number in future filings. Exhibit A has an Exhibit D sticker on it, which is incorrect. (JCH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Cain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold T. Cain
Represented By: David Ronald Musgrove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted
Represented By: David Ronald Musgrove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie P. Cain
Represented By: David Ronald Musgrove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HTC Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: David Ronald Musgrove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HTC Elite, L.P.
Represented By: David Ronald Musgrove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evan Trace Cain GST Trust
Represented By: John A. Banahan
Represented By: Michael R. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Logan Patrick Cain GST Trust
Represented By: John A. Banahan
Represented By: Michael R. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucinda K. Sloan
Represented By: John A. Banahan
Represented By: Michael R. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Elspeth A. England-Federal Gov
Represented By: Angela Givens Williams-Federal Gov
Represented By: Albert Thomas Morris-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?