Tucei v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lawrence Tucei
Defendant: BP Exploration & Production Inc. and BP America Production Company
Case Number: 1:2022cv00078
Filed: April 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 6/14/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert H Walker. (AB)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. That Attorney Dylan Boigris be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Plaintiff Lawrence Tucei in association with local counsel conditioned upon completion of the registration procedures found on the Court's website and at the following link: https://www.mssd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-page. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H Walker on 4/29/2022 (AB)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for Dylan Boigris to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AMSSDC-4825374) by Lawrence Tucei (Harris, Terris)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #17 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorneys Catherine Pyune McEldowney, Devin C. Reid, Georgia Lee Lucier, Kevin Michael, and Scott C. Seiler are hereby withdraw as counsel of record for Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., and BP America Production Company, and terminated on the docket. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE FROM THIS COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H Walker on 4/28/22 (TS)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Certain Counsel of Record by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (McLeod, Charles (Chan))
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Cecelia Virden on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Virden, Cecelia)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Christi G. Jones on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Jones, Christi)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard M. Crump on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Crump, Richard)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Autumn T. Breeden on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Breeden, Autumn)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles (Chan) E. McLeod on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (McLeod, Charles (Chan))
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Letter sent to Kevin Michael Hodges, Devin C. Reid, Scott C. Seiler, Dylan Boigris, Georgia Lee Lucier, and Catherine Pyune McEldowney on April 6, 2022 requesting PHV motion, proposed order and fee. (PKS)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:21-cv-01949. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 4/5/2022.(cwa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/5/2022.]
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Reid, Devin) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/5/2022.]
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that the Show Cause Order (ECF No. 27327 in 10-md-2179; ECF No. 5 in 21-1949) is SATISFIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 2/10/2022.(caa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/5/2022.]
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Notice of Compliance by Lawrence Tucei re #5 Order,,. (Boigris, Dylan) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/5/2022.]
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that, no later than MARCH 7, 2022, plaintiff Lawrence Tucei must provide full and complete initial disclosures. Failure to provide the disclosures by the above date will result in an order that plaintiff and their counsel must appear before Judge Barbier to show cause why their cases should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline by which Lawrence Tucei must submit a venue filing is extended to no later than APRIL 4, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 2/3/2022. (NEF: Section J)(sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/5/2022.]
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Scott C. Seiler added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Scott C. Seiler added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Seiler, Scott) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/5/2022.]
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER S NO.1 AND AMENDED ORDER NO.2. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Settlement Agreement)(cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/5/2022.]
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (go) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/5/2022.]
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9076037) filed by Lawrence Tucei. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Amended Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Dylan Boigris added to party Lawrence Tucei(pty:pla).(Boigris, Dylan) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/5/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tucei v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Tucei
Represented By: Dylan Boigris
Represented By: Dylan Boigris - PHV
Represented By: Terris C. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Exploration & Production Inc.
Represented By: Scott C. Seiler
Represented By: Catherine Pyune McEldowney
Represented By: Georgia Lee Lucier
Represented By: Kevin Michael *Hodges-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Devin C. *Reid-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Charles (Chan) E. McLeod
Represented By: Scott C. *Seiler-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Autumn T. Breeden
Represented By: Catherine Pyune *McEldowney-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Cecelia Virden
Represented By: Christi G. Jones
Represented By: Georgia Lee *Lucier-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Richard M. Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP America Production Company
Represented By: Scott C. Seiler
Represented By: Catherine Pyune McEldowney
Represented By: Devin C. *Reid-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Georgia Lee Lucier
Represented By: Kevin Michael *Hodges-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Charles (Chan) E. McLeod
Represented By: Scott C. *Seiler-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Autumn T. Breeden
Represented By: Catherine Pyune *McEldowney-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Cecelia Virden
Represented By: Christi G. Jones
Represented By: Georgia Lee *Lucier-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Richard M. Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?