Colville et al v. Becerra et al
Plaintiff: Amber Colville, Ralph Alvarado, State of Mississippi, State of Alabama, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Louisiana, State of Missouri and State of Montana
Defendant: Xavier Becerra, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Chiquita Brooks-LaSure, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services and United States of America
Case Number: 1:2022cv00113
Filed: May 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Taylor B McNeel
Referring Judge: Robert P Myers
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2022 Filing 13 Consent MOTION to Excuse Some Plaintiffs from Local Rule 83.1(d)(3) by Ralph Alvarado, Amber Colville, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Alabama, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana (Norris - PHV, Cameron)
May 24, 2022 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #9. Clerk corrected answer deadline to 7/16/2022. Defendant is a United States agency. (wld)
May 24, 2022 Set Deadlines: United States Department of Health and Human Services answer due 7/16/2022; United States of America answer due 7/16/2022. (wld)
May 23, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ralph Alvarado, Amber Colville. United States of America served on 5/12/2022, answer due 7/15/2022. (Young, Jennifer)
May 23, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ralph Alvarado, Amber Colville. United States of America served on 5/16/2022, answer due 7/15/2022. (Young, Jennifer)
May 23, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ralph Alvarado, Amber Colville. (Young, Jennifer)
May 23, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ralph Alvarado, Amber Colville. United States Department of Health and Human Services served on 5/17/2022, answer due 7/16/2022 (Young, Jennifer) Modified on 5/24/2022 to correct answer deadline. (wld).
May 23, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ralph Alvarado, Amber Colville. (Young, Jennifer)
May 23, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ralph Alvarado, Amber Colville. Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services served on 5/16/2022, answer due 6/6/2022. (Young, Jennifer)
May 23, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Carol Federighi-Federal Gov on behalf of All Defendants (Federighi-Federal Gov, Carol)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on May 12, 2022 (SK)
May 10, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Cameron T. Norris to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AMSSDC-4833975) by Ralph Alvarado, Amber Colville (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Young, Jennifer)
May 9, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Xavier Becerra, Chiquita Brooks-LaSure, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States of America (2). (RLW)
May 5, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin L. Matheny-State Gov on behalf of State of Mississippi (Matheny-State Gov, Justin)
May 5, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Xavier Becerra, Chiquita Brooks-LaSure, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States of America (Filing fee $ 402; receipt number 4831051), filed by State of Louisiana, Ralph Alvarado, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Missouri, State of Arizona, Amber Colville, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Montana, State of Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JCH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colville et al v. Becerra et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Colville
Represented By: Jennifer Moran Young
Represented By: Cameron T. Norris - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Alvarado
Represented By: Jennifer Moran Young
Represented By: Cameron T. Norris - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Mississippi
Represented By: Justin L. Matheny-State Gov
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Represented By: Cameron T. Norris - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Alabama
Represented By: Cameron T. Norris - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Arizona
Represented By: Cameron T. Norris - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Arkansas
Represented By: Cameron T. Norris - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Kentucky
Represented By: Cameron T. Norris - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Louisiana
Represented By: Cameron T. Norris - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Missouri
Represented By: Cameron T. Norris - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Montana
Represented By: Cameron T. Norris - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Carol Federighi-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Carol Federighi-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chiquita Brooks-LaSure
Represented By: Carol Federighi-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services
Represented By: Carol Federighi-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Carol Federighi-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?