Scoville et al v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc.
Plaintiff: Darwin William Scoville, Jr.
Defendant: BP Exploration & Production Inc. and BP America Production Company
Case Number: 1:2022cv00165
Filed: July 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Referring Judge: Robert P Myers
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2022 Filing 8 Letter sent to Hodges, McEldowney, Reid, Seiler, Durkee, Lucier and Mancini on 7/1/22 requesting PHV motion, proposed order and fee. (JCH)
July 1, 2022 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:22-cv-00528. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 1, 2022 Filing 6 Case transferred to Southern District of Mississippi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 7/1/2022.(cwa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/1/2022.]
June 30, 2022 Filing 5 Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Seiler, Scott) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/1/2022.]
April 1, 2022 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Scott C. Seiler added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Scott C. Seiler added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Seiler, Scott) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/1/2022.]
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDERS NO.1 AND AMENDED ORDER NO.2. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Settlement Agreement)(cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/1/2022.]
March 2, 2022 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (aj) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/1/2022.]
March 2, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9254020) filed by Darwin William Scoville, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Charles David Durkee added to party Darwin William Scoville, Jr(pty:pla).(Durkee, Charles) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/1/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scoville et al v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darwin William Scoville, Jr.
Represented By: Charles David Durkee
Represented By: Sara Marie Mancini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Exploration & Production Inc.
Represented By: Scott C. *Seiler-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Catherine Pyune *McEldowney-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Devin C. *Reid-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Georgia Lee Lucier
Represented By: Kevin Michael *Hodges-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP America Production Company
Represented By: Scott C. *Seiler-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Catherine Pyune *McEldowney-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Devin C. *Reid-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Georgia Lee Lucier
Represented By: Kevin Michael *Hodges-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?