Rouse et al v. Singing River Health System et al
Plaintiff: Kayla Rouse and Robert Rouse
Defendant: Singing River Health System doing business as Singing River Hospital, Donald K. Gaddy, Bradley Goldenberg and Teresa Monroe
Case Number: 1:2023cv00099
Filed: April 14, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Referring Judge: Robert P Myers
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2023 Filing 18 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 6/26/2023 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers Jr. (SR)
May 25, 2023 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by Bradley Goldenberg, Teresa Monroe, Singing River Health System.(Danos, Joshua)
May 22, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Lorraine Walters Boykin on behalf of Donald K. Gaddy (Boykin, Lorraine)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Bradley Goldenberg answer due 5/30/2023; Teresa Monroe answer due 5/30/2023; Singing River Health System answer due 5/30/2023. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on 5/19/2023 (SR)
May 18, 2023 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Donald K. Gaddy.(Johnson, Whitman)
May 17, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Bradley Goldenberg, Teresa Monroe, Singing River Health System (Danos, Joshua)
May 17, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua W. Danos on behalf of Bradley Goldenberg, Teresa Monroe, Singing River Health System (Danos, Joshua)
May 17, 2023 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #13 and #14: Advising attorney that the District Judge's initials must also be included after the case number on future filed pleadings. (RLW)
May 16, 2023 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #12: Scanned document contains blank page(s). PDF documents should be checked for errors before filing. It is not necessary to refile. (RLW)
May 15, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kayla Rouse, Robert Rouse. Bradley Goldenberg served on 5/5/2023, answer due 5/26/2023. (Morrison, Walter)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. Donald K. Gaddy answer due 5/19/2023. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on May 8, 2023 (SK)
May 5, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Donald K. Gaddy (Johnson, Whitman)
May 3, 2023 Filing 10 Summons Reissued as to Bradley Goldenberg. (wld)
May 3, 2023 Filing 9 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Kayla Rouse, Robert Rouse as to Bradley Goldenberg. (Morrison, Walter)
May 3, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kayla Rouse, Robert Rouse. Teresa Monroe served on 4/28/2023, answer due 5/19/2023. (Morrison, Walter)
May 3, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kayla Rouse, Robert Rouse. Singing River Health System served on 4/28/2023, answer due 5/19/2023. (Morrison, Walter)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on May 2, 2023 (SK)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER finding as moot #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. A later-filed PHV motion has been granted thereby rendering the instant motion moot. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on May 2, 2023 (SK)
April 25, 2023 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #4: Advising attorney that the case number should also include the judges initials, and the certificate of service is not signed by resident attorney. Attorney is not required to re-file. (RLW)
April 24, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Donald K. Gaddy, Bradley Goldenberg, Teresa Monroe, Singing River Health System. (RLW)
April 24, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Roger Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kayla Rouse, Robert Rouse (Attachments: #1 Attachment Letter of Good Standing)(Morrison, Walter)
April 24, 2023 Remark: Original issued summonses for service and return were mailed to attorney in prepaid Fed Ex envelope provided by attorney. (RLW)
April 21, 2023 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #3: Advising attorney that the case number must be included on all future filed pleadings. Also, the certificate of service page should have included the resident attorney's signature. (RLW)
April 20, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Roger Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kayla Rouse, Robert Rouse (Attachments: #1 Attachment Letter of Good Standing)(Morrison, Walter)
April 20, 2023 Filing 2 **DISREGARD** MOTION for Roger Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AMSSDC-5098595) by Kayla Rouse, Robert Rouse (Attachments: #1 Attachment Letter of Good Standing)(Morrison, Walter) Modified on 4/20/2023 (JCH).
April 20, 2023 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 2. Attorney contacted the court in regards to this Application. The application is not signed and will be re-filed. This document will be disregarded on the docket. Attorney's Office has been instructed to not pay the fee again. (JCH)
April 14, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Donald K. Gaddy, Bradley Goldenberg, Teresa Monroe, Singing River Health System (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number 5093554) filed by Kayla Rouse, Robert Rouse. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letters to Named Defendants, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Compliance, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(PKS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rouse et al v. Singing River Health System et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayla Rouse
Represented By: Walter C. Morrison, IV
Represented By: Roger Alan Johnson - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Rouse
Represented By: Walter C. Morrison, IV
Represented By: Roger Alan Johnson - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Singing River Health System doing business as Singing River Hospital
Represented By: Joshua W. Danos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald K. Gaddy
Represented By: Whitman B. Johnson, III
Represented By: Lorraine Walters Boykin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Goldenberg
Represented By: Joshua W. Danos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Monroe
Represented By: Joshua W. Danos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?