Heirs at Law of Eloise Banks et al v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Heirs at Law of Eloise Banks and Darrell O'Neal Banks
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC doing business as Mr. Cooper and Newrez, LLC doing business as Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Case Number: 1:2023cv00217
Filed: August 25, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Taylor B McNeel
Referring Judge: Robert P Myers
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2023 NOTICE of Hearing: TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 1/9/2024 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers Jr. Plaintiff will place the telephone call to Judge Myers' chambers with all necessary counsel on the line. (SR)
October 16, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 10/16/2023 with attorneys Michael J. Casano, John T. Rouse and Stevie F. Rushing. By agreement of the parties the Court will not enter a case management order. A telephonic status call will be scheduled for Tuesday, January 9, 2024 AT 1:30 PM. (SR)
October 13, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Service of Disclosure by Newrez, LLC (Rushing, Stevie)
October 12, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures by Newrez, LLC (Rushing, Stevie)
October 12, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosure by Darrell O'Neal Banks, Heirs at Law of Eloise Banks (Casano, Michael)
October 12, 2023 Filing 10 **ERROR**Disregard this entry. NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosure by Darrell O'Neal Banks, Heirs at Law of Eloise Banks (Casano, Michael) Modified on 10/12/2023 (RLW).
October 12, 2023 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #12: Incorrect event code chosen. This entry will be disregarded. Attorney is advised to re-file using the correct event, Notice of Service of Disclosure. (RLW)
October 12, 2023 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #9: Incorrect pdf document attached. This entry will be disregarded. See #11 for correct entry. DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #10: Incorrect event chosen. This entry will be disregarded. Attorney is advised to re-file using the correct event, Notice of Service of Designation of Experts. (RLW)
October 11, 2023 Filing 9 **ERROR**Disregard this entry. NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosure by Darrell O'Neal Banks, Heirs at Law of Eloise Banks (Casano, Michael) Modified on 10/12/2023 (RLW).
October 10, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosure by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (Rouse, John)
September 6, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay K. Roberts on behalf of Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (Roberts, Lindsay)
September 5, 2023 Filing 6 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 10/16/2023 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers Jr. (SR)
September 1, 2023 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Newrez, LLC (Rushing, Stevie)
September 1, 2023 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Nationstar Sub2 LLC, Corporate Parent Nationstar Mortgage Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent BlackRock, Inc., Corporate Parent Mr. Cooper Group Inc., Corporate Parent NationstarSub1 LLC, Corporate Parent The Vanguard Group, Inc. for Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Rouse, John)
September 1, 2023 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Recorded Deed of Trust, #2 Exhibit B-Escrow Waiver, Payment Letter, Coupons & Settlement Statement, #3 Exhibit C-Citi Goodbye Letter & Statement and Nationstar Hello Letter, #4 Exhibit D-Annual Tax & Interest and Escrow & Interest Statements, #5 Exhibit E-Hazard Insurance and LPI docs, #6 Exhibit F-Escrow Review Statements, #7 Exhibit G-Nationstars Goodbye Letter and Final Mortgage Statement, #8 Exhibit H-Nationstars Escrow Acct Disclosure Statement dated 5-12-20)(Rouse, John)
September 1, 2023 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #3: Incorrect event code chosen. This case was removed from state court, therefore, the event code, Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) should have been selected. Attorney is not required to re-file, but is advised to use this event code in the future when filing an Answer to a Complaint for cases removed from state court. (RLW)
August 29, 2023 Filing 2 Joinder in Document by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC to #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Newrez, LLC (Rouse, John)
August 25, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Newrez, LLC from Hancock County County Court, case number CC23-0197. Lower court jury demand. (Filing fee $ 402; receipt number 5197640) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Record, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(JCH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heirs at Law of Eloise Banks et al v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heirs at Law of Eloise Banks
Represented By: Michael J. Casano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell O'Neal Banks
Represented By: Michael J. Casano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC doing business as Mr. Cooper
Represented By: John T. Rouse
Represented By: Lindsay K. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newrez, LLC doing business as Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Represented By: Stevie F. Rushing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?