Badon v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP et al
Plaintiff: Charles Badon
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, John Does 1-5 and XYZ Corporations 1-5
Case Number: 1:2023cv00307
Filed: November 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Taylor B McNeel
Referring Judge: Robert P Myers
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2023 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #13: Advising attorney that the non party name in the notice and docket entry does not match the name on the attached subpoena. (RLW)
December 27, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA on Non-Party by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Attachments: #1 Supplement 1-NPS to CMS Atlanta)(DeLashmet, W.)
December 26, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA on Non-Parties by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Attachments: #1 Supplement 1-NPS to Workers Compensation Commission, #2 Supplement 2-NPS to Crosby Memorial Hospital, #3 Supplement 3-NPS to Mississippi Dept of Employment Security, #4 Supplement 4-NPS to Forrest General Hospital, #5 Supplement 5-NPS to HMS, #6 Supplement 6-NPS to Claims Management, Inc.)(DeLashmet, W.)
December 8, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Service of 1st Set of Request for Production by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (DeLashmet, W.)
December 8, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Service of 1st Set of Interrogatories by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (DeLashmet, W.)
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Jury Trial set during a three-week term of court beginning on 11/4/2024 09:00 AM in Courtroom 706 (Gulfport) before District Judge Taylor B. McNeel. Pretrial Conference set for 10/15/2024 10:00 AM in Courtroom 706 (Gulfport) before District Judge Taylor B. McNeel. Discovery due by 5/31/2024. Motions for Amended Pleadings due by 1/8/2024. Motions for Joinder of Parties due by 1/8/2024. Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 2/5/2024. Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 3/5/2024. Motions due by 6/14/2024. Settlement Conference set for 8/15/2024 09:30 AM in Courtroom 881 (Gulfport) before Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers Jr. ADR Report due by 10/8/2024. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/15/2024. EDT: 2-3 days. Parties do not consent. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on 12/7/2023 (SR)
December 7, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith B. Franklin on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Franklin, Keith)
December 7, 2023 Filing 7 **ERROR**Disregard this entry. NOTICE of Appearance by Keith B. Franklin on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Franklin, Keith) Modified on 12/7/2023 (RLW).
December 7, 2023 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #7: The Notice of Appearance filed by Attorney Franklin lists the incorrect defendants. This Notice will be disregarded and attorney is advised to refile listing the correct defendant's name within the body of the Notice and below the attorney's electronic signature. (RLW)
December 7, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 12/7/2023 with attorneys Lampton O'Neal Williams, Jr. and Keith B. Franklin. (SR)
December 5, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA on Non-Parties by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Attachments: #1 Supplement 1-NPS to Highland Community Hospital, #2 Supplement 2-NPS to Southern Physical Therapy Clinic, #3 Supplement 3-NPS to RASL d/b/a Access Radiology, #4 Supplement 4-NPS to Paradigm Health System, #5 Supplement 5-NPS to Sterling Surgical Hospital, #6 Supplement 6-NPS to MS Home Health Care, #7 Supplement 7-NPS to Humana, #8 Supplement 8-NPS to Mississippi Medicaid, #9 Supplement 9-NPS to Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services, #10 Supplement 10-NPS to Walgreens, #11 Supplement 11-NPS to SS&C, #12 Supplement 12-NPS to Willow Bend Emergency Group)(DeLashmet, W.)
November 30, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Service of Pre-Discovery Disclosure by Charles Badon (Williams, Lampton)
November 28, 2023 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (DeLashmet, W.)
November 28, 2023 Filing 3 **ERROR**Disregard this entry. NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (DeLashmet, W.) Modified on 11/28/2023 (RLW).
November 28, 2023 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #3: The incorrect event code was chosen. Also, the Notice states that Wal-Mart Stores East, LP is incorrectly identified as Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. which is incorrect. The defendant's name is only listed as Wal-Mart Stores East, LP on the docket. This entry is disregarded and attorney is advised to re-file using the correct event code, Notice of Service of Disclosure which is under Discovery Documents. No additional information should be added to docket entry. Also, the incorrectly identified verbiage should be removed before filing. (RLW)
November 7, 2023 Filing 2 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 12/7/2023 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers Jr. (SR)
November 6, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP from Circuit Court of Pearl River County, Mississippi, case number 55CI1:23cv101BT. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 5261029) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court File, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(wld)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Badon v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Badon
Represented By: Lampton O'Neal Williams, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: W. Pemble DeLashmet
Represented By: Keith B. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Corporations 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?