Hernandez v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP et al
Plaintiff: Leticia Hernandez
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP and John and Jane Does 1-10
Case Number: 1:2023cv00309
Filed: November 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Taylor B McNeel
Referring Judge: Robert P Myers
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2023 Filing 15 First NOTICE of Service of Propounded Request for Production by Leticia Hernandez (Courtney, Caleb)
December 18, 2023 Filing 14 First NOTICE of Service of Propounded Interrogatories by Leticia Hernandez (Courtney, Caleb)
December 15, 2023 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #12 and #13: Attorney is advised to list the 2nd defendant's name in the case style on future filed pleadings as it appears on the docket, John and Jane Does 1-10, not Fictitious Parties 1-10. ***Two previous annotations have been entered advising attorney of this request, 12/1/23, and 12/7/23. (RLW)
December 14, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Service of 1st Set of Request for Production by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (DeLashmet, W.)
December 14, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Service of 1st Set of Interrogatories by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (DeLashmet, W.)
December 13, 2023 Filing 11 **ERROR**Disregard this entry. NOTICE of Service of 1st Set of Request for Admissions by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (DeLashmet, W.) Modified on 12/13/2023 (RLW).
December 13, 2023 Filing 10 **ERROR**Disregard this entry. NOTICE of Service of 1st Set of Interrogatories by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (DeLashmet, W.) Modified on 12/13/2023 (RLW).
December 13, 2023 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #10 and #11: Incorrect document attached. Attorney is directed to refile and attach the correct pdf document. These docket entries will be disregarded. DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #11: Incorrect event code, Request for Admissions chosen. Attorney is advised to select the correct event code when re-filing. (RLW)
December 8, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosure by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (DeLashmet, W.)
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Jury Trial set during a three-week term of court beginning on 11/4/2024 09:00 AM in Courtroom 706 (Gulfport) before District Judge Taylor B. McNeel. Pretrial Conference set for 10/15/2024 10:00 AM in Courtroom 706 (Gulfport) before District Judge Taylor B. McNeel. Discovery due by 5/8/2024. Motions for Amended Pleadings due by 1/8/2024. Motions for Joinder of Parties due by 1/8/2024. Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 2/5/2024. Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 3/5/2024. Motions due by 5/22/2024. Settlement Conference set for 8/15/2024 01:30 PM in Courtroom 881 (Gulfport) before Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers Jr. ADR Report due by 10/8/2024. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/15/2024. 2-3 days. Parties do not consent. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on 12/7/2023 (SR)
December 7, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith B. Franklin on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Franklin, Keith)
December 7, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Caleb Joshua Courtney on behalf of Leticia Hernandez (Courtney, Caleb)
December 7, 2023 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #7: The main document should have been electronically signed by Keith Franklin, not W. Pemble DeLashmet. Also, John and Jane Does 1-10 must be listed in the case style on future filed documents, not Fictitious Parties 1-10. (RLW)
December 7, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 12/7/2023 with attorneys Caleb Joshua Courtney and Keith B. Franklin. (SR)
December 5, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA on Non-Parties by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Attachments: #1 Supplement 1-NPS to Memorial Orthopaedic, #2 Supplement 2-NPS to Advanced Therapy, #3 Supplement 3-NPS to Coast Heart, #4 Supplement 4-NPS to WellCare, #5 Supplement 5-NPS to American Medical Response)(DeLashmet, W.)
December 1, 2023 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #4: Incorrect event code chosen. This entry will be disregarded. Attorney is advised to re-file the Notice using the correct event, Notice of Service of Disclosure, which is under Discovery Documents. It is not necessary to add any additional verbiage to the docket entry. Also, Attorney is advised to list the 2nd defendant's name in the case style on this Notice before refiling and on future filed pleadings as it appears on the docket, John and Jane Does 1-10. (RLW)
December 1, 2023 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #3: Attorney is advised to list the 2nd defendant's name in the case style on future filed pleadings as it appears on the docket, John and Jane Does 1-10. (RLW)
November 30, 2023 Filing 4 **ERROR**Disregard this entry. NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures by Leticia Hernandez (Courtney, Caleb) Modified on 12/1/2023 (RLW).
November 15, 2023 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (DeLashmet, W.)
November 7, 2023 Filing 2 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 12/7/2023 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers Jr. (SR)
November 6, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP from Circuit Court of Harrison County, Mississippi, case number A2401-23-262. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 5261331) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court File, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(wld)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leticia Hernandez
Represented By: Michael Saltaformaggio
Represented By: Caleb Joshua Courtney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: W. Pemble DeLashmet
Represented By: Keith B. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?