Young v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Clarence Edward Young
Defendant: BP Exploration & Production Inc. and BP America Production Company
Case Number: 1:2023cv00319
Filed: November 16, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Taylor B McNeel
Referring Judge: Robert P Myers
2 Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2023 Filing 17 Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to #10 Pro Hac Vice Request Letter,. Mail sent to Kevin Michael Hodges (wld)
December 4, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Clarence Edward Young (JCH)
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Taylor B. McNeel recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Halil S. Ozerden for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Taylor B. McNeel on 11/20/23. (RLW)
November 20, 2023 Filing 14 Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to #10 Pro Hac Vice Request Letter,. Mail sent to Catherine Pyune McEldowney (wld)
November 20, 2023 Remark: Parties are advised to use newly assigned Judges initials on future filings, 1:23cv319 HSO-RPM. (RLW)
November 17, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #11 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Kevin M. Hodges, Catherine Pyune McEldowney, Devin C. Reid, Scott C. Seiler, and Georgia Lee Lucier. Attorneys Georgia Lee Lucier; Catherine Pyune McEldowney; Scott C. Seiler; Kevin Michael *Hodges-TRANSFER ATTORNEY and Devin C. *Reid-TRANSFER ATTORNEY are terminated as counsel of record. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on November 17, 2023 (SK)
November 16, 2023 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BP America Production Company identifying Corporate Parent BP p.l.c. for BP America Production Company. (McLeod, Charles (Chan))
November 16, 2023 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BP Exploration & Production Inc. identifying Corporate Parent BP p.l.c. for BP Exploration & Production Inc.. (McLeod, Charles (Chan))
November 16, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Kevin M. Hodges, Catherine Pyune McEldowney, Devin C. Reid, Scott C. Seiler, and Georgia Lee Lucier by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (McLeod, Charles (Chan))
November 16, 2023 Filing 10 Letter sent to Kevin Michael Hodges, Esq.; Devin C. Reid, Esq.; Charles David Durkee, Esq.; Samuel Gittle, Esq.; Georgia Lee Lucier, Esq.; Catherine Pyune McEldowney, Esq.; and Scott C. Seiler, Esq. on 11/16/23 requesting PHV motion, proposed order and fee. (JCH)
November 16, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard M. Crump on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Crump, Richard)
November 16, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles (Chan) E. McLeod on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (McLeod, Charles (Chan))
November 16, 2023 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:23-cv-02256. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 11/15/2023. (rt) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/16/2023.]
November 3, 2023 Filing 5 Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Seiler, Scott) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/16/2023.]
July 28, 2023 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Scott C. Seiler added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Scott C. Seiler added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Seiler, Scott) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/16/2023.]
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDERS NO.1 ANd AMENDED ORDER NO.2. Signed by Judge Carl J Barbier. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Settlement Agreement)(cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/16/2023.]
June 29, 2023 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl J Barbier and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (cc) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/16/2023.]
June 28, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-10005366) filed by Clarence Edward Young. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Charles David Durkee added to party Clarence Edward Young(pty:pla).(Durkee, Charles) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/16/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence Edward Young
Represented By: Charles David Durkee
Represented By: Samuel Gittle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Exploration & Production Inc.
Represented By: Charles (Chan) E. McLeod
Represented By: Richard M. Crump
Represented By: Scott C. Seiler
Represented By: Catherine Pyune McEldowney
Represented By: Devin C. *Reid-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Georgia Lee Lucier
Represented By: Kevin Michael *Hodges-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Catherine Pyune McEldowney-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Georgia Lee Lucier-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Kevin Michael Hodges-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Devin C. Reid-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Scott C. Seiler-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP America Production Company
Represented By: Richard M. Crump
Represented By: Scott C. Seiler
Represented By: Catherine Pyune McEldowney
Represented By: Devin C. *Reid-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Georgia Lee Lucier
Represented By: Kevin Michael *Hodges-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Charles (Chan) E. McLeod
Represented By: Catherine Pyune McEldowney-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Devin C. Reid-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Kevin Michael Hodges-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Scott C. Seiler-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Georgia Lee *Lucier-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?