Johnson v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Carlos Eugene Johnson
Defendant: United States of America and Pro Se Department
Case Number: 1:2023cv00347
Filed: December 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Southern Office
Presiding Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Referring Judge: Bradley W Rath
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 1/29/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bradley W. Rath on 12/29/2023 (CRT)
December 22, 2023 Filing 4 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Carlos Eugene Johnson (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Inmate Inquiry, #3 Envelope)(PKS)
December 1, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment mailed to Plaintiff. (wld)
December 1, 2023 Filing 2 LETTER MOTION for Return of Property by Carlos Eugene Johnson (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (wld)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER: Clerk is directed to Sever Defendant Carlos Eugene Johnson's 44 Letter Motion into a new civil case and to file in the new civil action a copy of this Order as well as the 44 Letter Motion. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr. on 12/1/2023 (wld)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Eugene Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Annette Williams-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?