Graybar Electric Company, Inc. v. Calgon Carbon Corporation
Plaintiff: Graybar Electric Company, Inc.
Defendant: Calgon Carbon Corporation
Case Number: 1:2023cv00366
Filed: December 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Taylor B McNeel
Referring Judge: Robert P Myers
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2024 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Calgon Carbon Corporation (Alexander, Roderick)
February 12, 2024 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #14 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's reply is now due 2/21/2024. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE FROM THIS COURT. Signed by District Judge Taylor B. McNeel on 2/12/2024. (RGK)
February 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on February 8, 2024 (pl)
February 7, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION for Gretchen L. Jankowski to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AMSSDC-5330916) by Calgon Carbon Corporation (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Alexander, Roderick)
February 7, 2024 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Graybar Electric Company, Inc. (Carson, Dorsey)
February 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on February 6, 2024 (pl)
February 5, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION for Gerald E. Burns to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AMSSDC-5328822) by Calgon Carbon Corporation (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Alexander, Roderick)
January 24, 2024 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Calgon Carbon Corporation (Alexander, Roderick)
January 24, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Calgon Carbon Corporation (Alexander, Roderick)
January 16, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Calgon Carbon Corporation (Alexander, Roderick)
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendant Calgon Carbon Corporation's answer or other responsive pleading is due 1/24/2024. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on January 16, 2024 (pl)
January 9, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Calgon Carbon Corporation (Alexander, Roderick)
January 9, 2024 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendant Calgon Carbon Corporation's answer or other responsive pleading is due 1/17/2024. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on January 9, 2024 (pl)
January 5, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn P. Goff on behalf of Graybar Electric Company, Inc. (Goff, Kathryn)
December 28, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Graybar Electric Company, Inc.. Calgon Carbon Corporation served on 12/20/2023, answer due 1/10/2024. (Carson, Dorsey)
December 18, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Calgon Carbon Corporation. (wld)
December 18, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Calgon Carbon Corporation ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number 5294060), filed by Graybar Electric Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Purchase Order, #2 Exhibit B-Invoice 9332369577, #3 Exhibit C-Bond to Discharge Lien, #4 Exhibit D-Non-Bonded Lien, #5 Exhibit E-Amended Non-Bonded Lien, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(wld)
December 18, 2023 Issued summons emailed to Dorsey R. Carson, Jr. at email address on docket. (wld)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graybar Electric Company, Inc. v. Calgon Carbon Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Graybar Electric Company, Inc.
Represented By: Dorsey R. Carson, Jr.
Represented By: Kathryn P. Goff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calgon Carbon Corporation
Represented By: Gerald E. Burns, III - PHV
Represented By: Gretchen Lee Jankowski - PHV
Represented By: Roderick Mark Alexander, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?