Handshaw v. Ledbetter et al
Plaintiff: Shone E. Handshaw
Defendant: Jackson County Sheriff, Unknown Richards, Unknown Woods and John Ledbetter
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 1:2024cv00082
Filed: March 19, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Robert P Myers
Referring Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr. Signed by District Judge Halil S. Ozerden on 5/14/24. (JCH)
May 13, 2024 Filing 23 NOTICE Mail Returned as Undeliverable by John Ledbetter, Unknown Richards re #16 Response to Order,, #14 Waiver of Service Executed, #13 Notice of Appearance, #17 Notice of Appearance, #15 Waiver of Service Executed (Richardson-County Gov, Anna)
May 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying #21 Motion for Subpoena without prejudice to Plaintiff's ability to seek the desired information through ordinary discovery mechanisms at the appropriate time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on 5/9/2024 (Attachments: #1 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 34) (CRT)
May 8, 2024 Filing 21 MOTION for Subpoena by Shone E. Handshaw (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JCH)
May 8, 2024 Filing 20 NOTICE of Change of Address by Shone E. Handshaw: # 39466, CMCF, P.O. Box 88550, Pearl, MS 39208. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JCH)
April 23, 2024 Filing 19 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Unknown Woods on 4/23/24. Waiver of Service due by 5/23/2024. (RLW)
April 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Clerk is directed to re-issue a Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons for Defendant Parole Officer Unknown Woods. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr. on 4/23/24 (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons Form, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons Form). (RLW)
April 23, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Jackye C. Bertucci-County Gov on behalf of John Ledbetter, Unknown Richards (Bertucci-County Gov, Jackye)
April 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Response to Order re #9 ORDER: Clerk is directed to issue a Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons for Defendants Sheriff John Ledbetter, Deputy Unknown Richards,and Parole Officer Unknown Woods. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr. on 4/12/24 (Attachments: # 1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons Form - Ledbetter, # 2 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons Form - Richards, # 3 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons Form - Woods, # 4 Waiver of the Service of Summons Form) (RLW) filed by John Ledbetter, Unknown Richards (Richardson-County Gov, Anna)
April 22, 2024 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John Ledbetter. John Ledbetter waiver sent on 4/12/2024, answer due 6/11/2024. (Richardson-County Gov, Anna)
April 22, 2024 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Unknown Richards. Unknown Richards waiver sent on 4/12/2024, answer due 6/11/2024. (Richardson-County Gov, Anna)
April 19, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Anna Juliet Richardson-County Gov on behalf of John Ledbetter, Unknown Richards (Richardson-County Gov, Anna)
April 12, 2024 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Unknown Woods on 4/12/24. Waiver of Service due by 5/13/2024. (RLW)
April 12, 2024 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Unknown Richards on 4/12/24. Waiver of Service due by 5/13/2024. (RLW)
April 12, 2024 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to John Ledbetter on 4/12/24. Waiver of Service due by 5/13/2024. (RLW)
April 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Clerk is directed to issue a Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons for Defendants Sheriff John Ledbetter, Deputy Unknown Richards,and Parole Officer Unknown Woods. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr. on 4/12/24 (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons Form - Ledbetter, #2 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons Form - Richards, #3 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons Form - Woods, #4 Waiver of the Service of Summons Form) (RLW)
April 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER AMENDING DOCKET: Clerk shall replace Jackson County Sheriff with Sheriff John Ledbetter as defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr. on 4/12/24. (RLW)
April 11, 2024 Filing 7 Response to Order re #6 ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND, filed by Shone E. Handshaw (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (RLW)
April 11, 2024 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #7: L.U.Civ.R. 11.(a) states that all documents filed and signed by a party not represented by attorney(s) must contain the party's name, and current address. Party is advised to comply with the requirement in future filings. (RLW)
April 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND: Plaintiff shall file a written response consistent with this Order by April 19, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on 4/5/2024 (CRT)
April 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and setting payment schedule as set forth in order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on 4/5/2024 (CRT)
April 5, 2024 Filing 4 Acknowledgment of Receipt of Prisoner Litigation Reform Act and Amendments to MCA 47-5-138 as to #3 Order Opsp2. Acknowledgement filed by Shone E. Handshaw (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (RLW)
March 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 4/24/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on 3/25/2024 (CRT)
March 19, 2024 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Shone E. Handshaw (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JCH)
March 19, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jackson County Sheriff, Unknown Richards, Unknown Woods, filed by Shone E. Handshaw. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Assignment, #2 Envelope)(JCH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Handshaw v. Ledbetter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shone E. Handshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson County Sheriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Richards
Represented By: Anna Juliet Richardson-County Gov
Represented By: Jackye C. Bertucci-County Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Ledbetter
Represented By: Anna Juliet Richardson-County Gov
Represented By: Jackye C. Bertucci-County Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?