Graves et al v. Toyota Motor Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Wayne Graves and Mary Graves
Defendant: Toyota Motor Corporation and Toyota Motor Sales USA
Case Number: 2:2009cv00169
Filed: August 26, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Hattiesburg Office
County: Jones
Presiding Judge: Michael T. Parker
Presiding Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER denying Defendants' 277 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, or Alternatively, for New Trial, or, Alternatively, to Alter or Amend the Judgment. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on May 4, 2012 (dsl)
March 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER re 265 Objection to Plaintiff's Form of Judgment filed by Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales USA. The plaintiffs' form of the Judgment will be entered by this Court and the Objection filed by defendants is overruled. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 3/2/12 (scp)
January 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER denying Plaintiffs' Second 190 Motion in Limine regarding CellularSouth Phone Records. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on January 11, 2012 (dsl)
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 188 Motion in Limine regarding Statements in Medical Records Regarding the Cause of the Subject Accident. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on January 10, 2012 (dsl)
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER denying Defendants' 182 Motion in Limine to Exclude Opinions of Stephen Forrest on Restraint Systems and Biomechanics. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on January 9, 2012 (dsl)
January 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER denying Defendants' Fourth 178 Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence Regrading Reference to Volvo, the Volvo XC90, and Information from Other Manufacturers. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on January 6, 2012 (dsl)
January 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER granting Defendants' 172 Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Testimony Pertaining to Changes to Federal Safety Regulations and Ratings After 1995. The Court prohibits any references to any new FMVSS 216 standard, other safety rating s, and other evidence and testimony pertaining to the internal or external communications between Toyota, NHTSA, or other automakers regarding changes in federal legislation or regulations to FMVSS 216 which took place after the subject vehicle was manufactured and sold. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on January 5, 2012 (dsl)
October 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 133 Motion for Summary Judgment. The motion is granted on the issue of Graves' breach of warranty claims but is denied in all other respects. A separate judgment on the breach of warranty claims will be entered in accordance with Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on October 3, 2011 (dsl)
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 135 Motion to Exclude Opinion Evidence to be Offered by Lance Taylor and granting Plaintiffs' 137 Motion to Exclude Opinion Evidence to be Offered by David Smith. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on September 30, 2011 (dsl)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graves et al v. Toyota Motor Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Graves
Represented By: W. Dal Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Graves
Represented By: W. Dal Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Sales USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?