Jordan v. Epps et al
Plaintiff: Kelvin Jordan
Defendant: Earnest Lee and Pelicia Hall
Case Number: 2:2013cv00301
Filed: July 10, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Eastern (Hattiesburg) Office
County: Clarke
Presiding Judge: Tom S. Lee
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting 92 Motion to Extend Deadline to submit motion to file amended habeas petition. The motion to file amended habeas petition is due on or before October 15, 2018. Signed by District Judge Tom S. Lee on July 26, 2018 (Rushing, Terryl)
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting 88 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Thomas C. Levidiotis for Kelvin Jordan. Attorney Stacy Ferraro terminated; granting 89 Motion to Extend Deadline; counsel to submit,ex parte, proposed budget by April 16, 2018; motion for leave to file amended petition due by August 16, 2018. Signed by District Judge Tom S. Lee on March 13, 2018 (Rushing, Terryl)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Motion Granting in Part and Denying in Part 84 Request for Scheduling Order filed by Kelvin Jordan. The Request is denied to the extent that it seeks permission to file an amended petition within 120 days, but it is granted to the extent that it seeks permission to file a motion for leave to amend petition within 120 days. The motion for leave to file an amended petition is due on or before November 28, 2017. Signed by District Judge Tom S. Lee on August 3, 2017 (Rushing, Terryl)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jordan v. Epps et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelvin Jordan
Represented By: Stacy Ferraro(Designation CJA Appointment)
Represented By: Robert S. Mink(Designation CJA Appointment)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earnest Lee
Represented By: Marvin L. White, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pelicia Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?