Parker v. Leaf River Cellulose, LLC
Plaintiff: Joseph Edward Parker
Defendant: Leaf River Cellulose, LLC
Case Number: 2:2014cv00009
Filed: January 23, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Eastern (Hattiesburg) Office
County: Perry
Presiding Judge: Michael T. Parker
Presiding Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER denying 90 Motion in Limine; denying 92 Motion in Limine Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 8/9/17 (dtj)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER Plaintiff has until on or before August 1, 2017, to file a response to Motions in Limine 90 and 92 . Defendant's rebuttal is due on or before August 8, 2017. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 7/25/2017 (dtj)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER denying 82 Motion for Certification Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 6/26/2017 (dtj)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER. Plaintiff has until on or before June 15, 2017, to respond to 82 Motion for Certification.If Movant wishes to file a rebuttal, it may do so on or before June 22, 2017. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 6/2/2017 (dtj)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting 69 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 71 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 5/18/2017 (dtj)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER. Plaintiff has until on or before May 8, 2017, to respond to Motion for Summary Judgment 71 . If Movant wishes to file a rebuttal, he may do so on or before May 15, 2017. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 4/25/2017 (dtj)
December 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting Defendant's 7 Motion to Dismiss. This cause is dismissed with prejudice. A separate Judgment shall be entered. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on December 19, 2014 (dsl)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. Leaf River Cellulose, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Edward Parker
Represented By: Michael R. Martz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leaf River Cellulose, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?