Turnage et al v. Messersmith Manufacturing, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jonathan Davis Turnage and Angela Turnage
Defendant: MesserSmith Manufacturing, Inc. and John Does A through Z
Case Number: 2:2014cv00124
Filed: August 7, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Eastern (Hattiesburg) Office
County: Lawrence
Presiding Judge: Michael T. Parker
Presiding Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER denying 41 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 4/14/2016 (scp)
February 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 34 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's claims against McConnell Technologies are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 2/9/2016 (scp)
January 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting Defendant's 4 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction; granting Plaintiffs' 11 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint; and denying Plaintiffs' 12 Motion for Jurisdictional Discovery. Plaintiffs& #039; claims against Defendant Messersmith Manufacturing, Inc. are dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiffs shall file their Amended Complaint within two (2) weeks of the entry of this order. Failure to do so may lead to the dismissal of this case in its entirety. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on January 14, 2015 (dsl)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turnage et al v. Messersmith Manufacturing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Davis Turnage
Represented By: Alfred Lee Felder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Turnage
Represented By: Alfred Lee Felder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MesserSmith Manufacturing, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Gerald Norris, II
Represented By: John Stuart Robinson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does A through Z
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?