Corinthian Court Holdings, LLC v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Corinthian Court Holdings, LLC
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 2:2015cv00111
Filed: August 28, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Eastern (Hattiesburg) Office
County: Lamar
Presiding Judge: Michael T. Parker
Presiding Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 145 **ERROR DISREGARD THIS ENTRY** ORDER. Plaintiff Marvin McCraney, Jr. has until on or before May 30, 2017, to respond to Motion for Summary Judgment 48 . If Movant wishes to file a rebuttal, it may do so on or before June 6, 2017. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 5/16/2017 (dtj) Modified on 5/16/2017 (CS).
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER granting in part and deferring in part 124 Motion in Limine; granting in part and deferring in part 126 Motion in Limine; denying 128 Motion in Limine; deferring 130 Motion in Limine; denying 132 Motion in Limine Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 5/15/2017 (dtj)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER. Responses to Motions In Limine 124 , 126 , 128 , 130 , and 132 are due seven days prior to pretrial conference scheduled for May 18, 2017, making responses due on or before May 11, 2017. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 5/5/2017 (dtj)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting 82 Motion to Strike Smith ; deferring ruling on 84 Motion to Strike Hall until after hearing can be held in this matter ; denying 106 Motion to Strike Hall Affidavit ; denying 108 Motion to Strike Smith Affidavit Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 4/6/2017 (dtj)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER. Plaintiff has until March 21, 2017 to respond to 106 and 108 . If Movant wishes to file a rebuttal, it may do so on or before March 28, 2017. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 3/8/2017 (dtj)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER. Plaintiff Corinthian Court Holdings, LLC has until on or before February 7, 2017 to respond to 82 , 84 , and 86 . If Movant wishes to file a rebuttal, it may do so on or before February 14, 2017. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 1/27/2017 (dtj)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER denying 48 Motion to Compel; denying 51 Motion to Quash; and denying 59 Motion to Extend Deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on January 17, 2017. (js)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER denying 31 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on December 16, 2016. (js)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corinthian Court Holdings, LLC v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corinthian Court Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Deborah R. Trotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?