Hollingsworth et al v. Hercules, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lee Hollingsworth and Scott Hollingsworth
Defendant: Hercules, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2015cv00113
Filed: August 31, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Eastern (Hattiesburg) Office
County: Forrest
Presiding Judge: Michael T. Parker
Presiding Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER Re Motion in Limine 118 and Motion in Limine 120 . Responses are due on or before January 19, 2017. Replies may be filed within seven days of the filing of response, but no later than January 26, 2017. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 1/9/2017 (dtj)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER re Motion to Bifurcate Trial 115 . Plaintiffs shall respond on or before January 17, 2017. Defendant may reply on or before January 24, 2017. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 1/4/2017 (dtj)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER denying 65 Motion to Exclude; denying 67 Motion to Exclude Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 1/3/2017 (dtj)
December 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER denying Plaintiffs' 69 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on December 23, 2016 (dsl)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 72 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on December 22, 2016 (dsl)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hollingsworth et al v. Hercules, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Hollingsworth
Represented By: William S. Cox - PHV
Represented By: John Mann Johnson - PHV
Represented By: Adam K. Peck - PHV
Represented By: William Larkin Radney - PHV, IV
Represented By: Clinton Timothy Speegle - PHV
Represented By: Winston James Thompson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Hollingsworth
Represented By: William S. Cox - PHV
Represented By: John Mann Johnson - PHV
Represented By: Adam K. Peck - PHV
Represented By: William Larkin Radney - PHV, IV
Represented By: Clinton Timothy Speegle - PHV
Represented By: Winston James Thompson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hercules, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?