Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company v. Neshoba County Fair Association, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Defendant: Neshoba County Fair Association, Inc., Niel Little, Wendy Little, ABC Individuals 1-20 and XYZ Entities 1-20
Case Number: 2:2016cv00043
Filed: April 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Eastern (Hattiesburg) Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Michael T. Parker
Presiding Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER. Responses to 50 Motion for Summary Judgment due February 2, 2107. If movant wishes to file a rebuttal, it may do so on or before February 9, 2017. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 1/20/2017 (dtj)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting 38 Motion to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint. The Third-Party complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 12/20/2016 (dtj)
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting Plaintiff Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company's 22 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on November 8, 2016 (dsl)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company v. Neshoba County Fair Association, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Clyde X. Copeland, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neshoba County Fair Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Niel Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Individuals 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Entities 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?