FC Meyer Packaging, LLC v. Converting Alternatives International
Plaintiff: FC Meyer Packaging, LLC
Defendant: Converting Alternatives International
Case Number: 2:2016cv00080
Filed: June 9, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Eastern (Hattiesburg) Office
County: Clarke
Presiding Judge: Michael T. Parker
Presiding Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER denying 56 Motion to Strike and directing both parties to supplement their expert designations on or before March 31, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on March 21, 2017. (jg)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 40 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses and Certain Depositions filed by FC Meyer Packaging, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on February 27, 2017. (jg)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 18 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on November 18, 2016 (dsl)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FC Meyer Packaging, LLC v. Converting Alternatives International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FC Meyer Packaging, LLC
Represented By: James C. Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Converting Alternatives International
Represented By: James Seth McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?