Edmonson v. Sullivan et al
Plaintiff: Kenny Franklin Edmonson
Defendant: Matthew Gordon Sullivan, Grover Brothers Equipment, Inc., Hub Refrigeration & Fixture Co., Inc. and Others Unknown to Plaintiff, but not Limited to.
Case Number: 2:2017cv00032
Filed: March 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Eastern (Hattiesburg) Office
County: Jones
Presiding Judge: Michael T. Parker
Presiding Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. Plaintiff, within ten (10) days of the date of this Order must show cause why his complaint should not be dismissed for failure to pay applicable court costs. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 6/14/2017 (dtj)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. Objection 11 is overruled. Plaintiff is reminded that the Order adopting the Report and Recommendation 10 makes the filing fee due on or before May 26, 2017. Plaintiff is warned that if the filing fee is not timely paid pursuant to the Order then the Complaint is subject to being dismissed without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 5/15/2017 (dtj)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Motions for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis 2 and 6 are denied. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 5/8/2017 (dtj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edmonson v. Sullivan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenny Franklin Edmonson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Gordon Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grover Brothers Equipment, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hub Refrigeration & Fixture Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Others Unknown to Plaintiff, but not Limited to.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?