Gilmore v. State of Mississippi et al
Plaintiff: Karlene Gilmore
Defendant: State of Mississippi, Mississippi Military Department, Gregory Michel and United States of America
Case Number: 2:2017cv00063
Filed: May 4, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Eastern (Hattiesburg) Office
County: Forrest
Presiding Judge: Michael T. Parker
Presiding Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER. Plaintiff has until on or before August 1, 2017, to respond to Motion for Reconsideration 47 and Motion to Stay 49 . If Movants wish to file rebuttals, they may do so on or before August 8, 2017. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 7/18/2017 (dtj)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER. Plaintiff has 7 days from the date of this Order to file a sur-response to Reply 39 which contains Declaration [39-1]. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 6/29/2017 (dtj)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER. Defendants have until on or before May 24, 2017, to respond to Motion to Stay Proceedings 10 . If Movant wishes to file a rebuttal, she may do so on or before May 31, 2017. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 5/11/2017 (dtj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilmore v. State of Mississippi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karlene Gilmore
Represented By: Daniel M. Waide
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Mississippi
Represented By: Robert J. Dambrino, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi Military Department
Represented By: Robert J. Dambrino, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Michel
Represented By: Kristi H. Johnson-Federal Gov(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Kristi H. Johnson-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?