Wicht et al v. City of Hattiesburg
Plaintiff: Ramona Lisa Wicht and Wade Wicht
Defendant: City of Hattiesburg
Case Number: 2:2018cv00144
Filed: August 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Eastern (Hattiesburg) Office
County: Forrest
Presiding Judge: Michael T Parker
Referring Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1365
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2018 Filing 5 JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL, the parties having announced that they have reached a compromise and settlement of all pending claims in this matter; this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice as to all parties. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 08/21/2018. [Copy of Judgment mailed to Pro Se litigants] (CS)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #2 MOTION to Dismiss filed by City of Hattiesburg. Response due on or before 8/22; reply due on or before 8/29. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 8/9/18. (cb)
August 8, 2018 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #2 MOTION to Dismiss filed by City of Hattiesburg (Dossett, Robert)
August 8, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss by City of Hattiesburg (Dossett, Robert)
August 7, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by City of Hattiesburg from Circuit Court of Forrest County, Mississippi, case number W18-0076. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 24643005839) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Documents) (CS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wicht et al v. City of Hattiesburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramona Lisa Wicht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wade Wicht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Hattiesburg
Represented By: Robert Lane Dossett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?