Cloud 9 Vapors LLC v. Cloud 9 Vapes, LLC

Plaintiff: Cloud 9 Vapors LLC
Defendant: Cloud 9 Vapes, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv00146
Filed: August 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Eastern (Hattiesburg) Office
County: Forrest
Presiding Judge: Michael T Parker
Referring Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosure by Cloud 9 Vapors LLC (Williams, Michael)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Alexa Stabler-Adams is hereby admitted pro hac vice upon registering for electronic filing. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on September 19, 2018 (KPM)
September 19, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Alexa Stabler-Adams to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-3812634) by Cloud 9 Vapes, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Certificate of Good Standing)(McDavid, Stephan)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Jeremy Allen Smith is hereby admitted pro hac vice upon registering for electronic filing. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on September 18, 2018 (KPM)
September 18, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Jeremy Allen Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-3811396) by Cloud 9 Vapors LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Certificate of Good Standing re Jeremy Allen Smith)(Williams, Michael)
September 14, 2018 Filing 5 Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 10/17/2018 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker. Counsel shall dial 1.888.273.3658, code 1055457 to connect to the call. Confidential settlement memoranda are due on or before 10/12/18. (KPM)
September 7, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to #3 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Cloud 9 Vapors LLC.(Williams, Michael)
August 21, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Cloud 9 Vapors LLC by Cloud 9 Vapes, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Use of CLOUD 9 VAPES trademark, #2 Exhibit B:Use of CLOUD 9 VAPORS trademark, #3 Exhibit C: Text messages acknowledging customer confusion)(McDavid, Stephan)
August 15, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF MAILING of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark re #1 Notice of Removal. (LDR)
August 15, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cloud 9 Vapors LLC from Circuit Court of Forrest County, Mississippi, case number H18-0111. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-378545) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Summons and Complaint)(LDR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cloud 9 Vapors LLC v. Cloud 9 Vapes, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cloud 9 Vapors LLC
Represented By: Michael C. Williams
Represented By: Jeremy Allen Smith - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cloud 9 Vapes, LLC
Represented By: Stephan L. McDavid
Represented By: Alexa Stabler - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?