Moore v. Community Bank
Plaintiff: Gary Moore
Defendant: Community Bank
Case Number: 2:2018cv00198
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael T Parker
Referring Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #5 : There is an error in this entry and it should be disregarded. It has been correctly refiled as Doc #6 . (LDR)
December 6, 2018 Filing 6 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Gary Moore. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(LDR)
December 6, 2018 Filing 5 **ERROR, DISREGARD THIS ENTRY** *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Gary Moore. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(LDR) Modified on 12/6/2018 (LDR).
December 3, 2018 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP. Objections to R&R due by 12/17/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on December 3, 2018. (js)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on November 21, 2018. (js)
November 20, 2018 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Gary Moore. (LDR)
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Community Bank, filed by Gary Moore. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope, #3 Notice of Assignment)(LDR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Community Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?