Davis-Moab v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Rodne' Davis-Moab
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA General Counsel
Case Number: 2:2018cv00204
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Remark: Copy of Order Staying Case and NEF mailed Rodne' Davis-Moab, 504 Melba Ave., Hattiesburg, MS. 39401 (SAM)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER STAYING CASE due to lapse of appropriations. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III on 1/16/2019 (SAM)
January 18, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristi H. Johnson-Federal Gov on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Johnson-Federal Gov, Kristi)
January 16, 2019 Filing 12 U.S. Marshal's Return Executed as to Office of the Regional Chief Counsel, Region VI. Commissioner of Social Security served on 1/8/2019, answer due 4/8/2019. (CS)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying without prejudice #7 Motion for Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 1/14/2019 (AG)
January 11, 2019 Filing 10 U.S. Marshal's Return Executed as to Attorney General. Commissioner of Social Security served on 12/27/2018, answer due 3/27/2019. (CS)
January 11, 2019 Filing 9 U.S. Marshal's Return Executed as to U.S. Attorney, Civil Process Clerk. Commissioner of Social Security served on 1/10/2019, answer due 4/10/2019. (CS)
January 2, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM BRIEF re #4 Order filed by Rodne' Davis-Moab. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Various Documents) (CS)
January 2, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Discovery, MOTION to Overturn Decision re #4 Order by Rodne' Davis-Moab. (CS)
December 3, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (CS)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER, Clerk is directed to prepare and issue summonses for the Commissioner of Social Security. The USM Service is ordered to serve process on Defendant and file return summonses. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 12/03/2018. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff] (CS)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER requiring answer and briefing. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 12/3/2018 (AG)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 12/3/2018 (AG)
November 29, 2018 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Rodne' Davis-Moab. (CS)
November 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Rodne' Davis-Moab. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-Various Documents) (CS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis-Moab v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Kristi H. Johnson-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodne' Davis-Moab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?