Bond v. Gunter et al

Plaintiff: Angela Bond
Defendant: Gunter Honey, Inc. and Dwight Gunter
Case Number: 2:2018cv00207
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael T Parker
Referring Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Service of Pre-Discovery Disclosure by Angela Bond (Chabert, Scotty)
January 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Service of Request for Production by Dwight Gunter (Smith, Philip)
January 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Service of Interrogatories by Dwight Gunter (Smith, Philip)
January 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Service of Pre-Discovery Disclosure by Dwight Gunter, Gunter Honey, Inc. (Smith, Philip)
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Service of Corporate Disclosure by Gunter Honey, Inc. (Smith, Philip)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4 Rule 16(a) Initial Order:Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 2/7/2019 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker. Counsel shall dial 1.888.273.3658, code 1055457 to connect to the call. Confidential settlement memoranda are due on or before 2/1/19. (KPM)
December 7, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Gunter Honey, Inc..(Smith, Philip)
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Dwight Gunter.(Smith, Philip)
December 5, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Dwight Gunter, Gunter Honey, Inc. from Circuit Court of Lamar County, Mississippi, case number 1:18-cv-00104-AM. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0538-3869030) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit B-State Court Complaint, #4 Exhibit C-State Court Summons to Dwight Gunter, #5 Exhibit D-State Court Summons to Gunter Honey, Inc.) (CS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bond v. Gunter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gunter Honey, Inc.
Represented By: Philip G Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwight Gunter
Represented By: Philip G Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Bond
Represented By: Scotty E. Chabert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?