Gammill v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Deidra Gammill
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, Trans Union, LLC and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00210
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
0 Judge: Michael T Parker
1 Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Taylor Kosla is hereby admitted pro hac vice upon payment of the pro hac admission fee and registering for electronic filing. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on January 25, 2019 (KPM)
January 25, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee paid for Taylor Kosla receipt number 0538-3901475 $ 100 (Hormozdi, Shireen)
January 25, 2019 **ERROR DISREGARD THIS ENTRY** Pro Hac Vice fee NOT PAID for Taylor Kosla $ 100 (Hormozdi, Shireen) Modified on 1/28/2019 (CS).
January 25, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Taylor Kosla to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee) by Deidra Gammill (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Hormozdi, Shireen)
January 7, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Settlement as to Equifax Information Services, LLC only by Deidra Gammill (Hormozdi, Shireen)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. For good cause shown and without opposition, Equifax's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer is granted. Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due on or before 1/28/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on December 28, 2018. (MMc)
December 27, 2018 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Equifax Information Services, LLC (Pickett, Kaytie)
December 26, 2018 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian Information Solutions, Inc. for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Henson, Finisse)
December 26, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Henson, Finisse)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Trans Union, LLC answer due on or before 1/30/2019. No further written order shall issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on December 20, 2018. (MMc)
December 20, 2018 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trans Union, LLC (Driskell, Mitchell)
December 20, 2018 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Trans Union, LLC (Driskell, Mitchell)
December 18, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deidra Gammill. Trans Union, LLC served on 12/7/2018, answer due 12/31/2018. (Hormozdi, Shireen)
December 18, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deidra Gammill. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 12/10/2018, answer due 12/31/2018. (Hormozdi, Shireen)
December 18, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deidra Gammill. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 12/10/2018, answer due 12/31/2018.(Hormozdi, Shireen)
December 12, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #3 , #4 , #5 : Proof of Service of a summons should be completed and filed with the first page, as issued. Attachment of an Affidavit of Service/Return of Service is not sufficient without completed proof. Attorney is directed to refile using AO form 440 page 1 and 2 and may attach the Affidavit of Service/Return of Service as an exhibit with a description. (CS)
December 11, 2018 Filing 5 **ERROR DISREGARD THIS ENTRY** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deidra Gammill. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 12/10/2018, answer due 12/31/2018. (Hormozdi, Shireen) Modified on 12/13/2018 (CS).
December 11, 2018 Filing 4 **ERROR DISREGARD THIS ENTRY** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deidra Gammill. Trans Union, LLC served on 12/10/2018, answer due 12/31/2018. (Hormozdi, Shireen) Modified on 12/13/2018 (CS).
December 11, 2018 Filing 3 **ERROR DISREGARD THIS ENTRY** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deidra Gammill. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 12/7/2018, answer due 12/28/2018. (Hormozdi, Shireen) Modified on 12/13/2018 (CS).
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Trans Union, LLC. (CS)
November 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Trans Union, LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 24643006008), filed by Deidra Gammill. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (CS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gammill v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Kaytie M. Pickett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Mitchell O. Driskell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Finisse Ewin Henson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deidra Gammill
Represented By: Shireen Hormozdi
Represented By: Taylor Kosla - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?