Pickett v. Mississippi Board of Animal Health

Plaintiff: Anna Katherine Pickett
Defendant: Mississippi Board of Animal Health
Case Number: 2:2018cv00214
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Michael T Parker
2 Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 Filing 6 Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 3/25/2019 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo. (AB)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 02/07/2019. (CS)
February 6, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Mississippi Board of Animal Health.(May-State Gov, Benny)
January 31, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anna Katherine Pickett. Mississippi Board of Animal Health served on 1/17/2019, answer due 2/7/2019. (Waide, Jim)
December 12, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Mississippi Board of Animal Health. (CS)
December 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mississippi Board of Animal Health (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0538-3873913), filed by Anna Katherine Pickett. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A: EEOC Charge Dated 3/10/2017 v. Sanderson Farms, Inc., #3 Exhibit B: Email Exchange, #4 Exhibit C: Complaint in Cause No. 2:17-cv-203, #5 Exhibit D: EEOC Charge, #6 Exhibit E: Right to Sue Letter) (CS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pickett v. Mississippi Board of Animal Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi Board of Animal Health
Represented By: Benny McCalip May-State Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Katherine Pickett
Represented By: Jim D. Waide, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?