El-Hosseiny v. Wiggen et al

Plaintiff: Samir El-Hosseiny
Defendant: Arrests.org and Craig Robert Wiggen
Case Number: 2:2019cv00010
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael T Parker
Referring Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Amend. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on February 22, 2019. (MMc)
February 19, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Amend Attachments in Initial Claim and Request for Injunction re #1 Complaint by Samir El-Hosseiny. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B.1-Defendant Craig Robert Wiggen, #2 Exhibit B.2-whoisprivacy.com, #3 Exhibit B.3-Who Is History Records, #4 Exhibit B.4-337Services,LLC, #5 Exhibit B.5-Masking Service, #6 Exhibit B.6-NJALLA General Terms and Conditions, #7 Exhibit B.6A-Arrests.org and Masking Services, #8 Exhibit B.6B-Florida.arrests.org, #9 Exhibit B.6C-Mississippi.arrests.org, #10 Exhibit B.7-Problems URL's of Plaintiff, #11 Exhibit B.8-Pacemonitor Pulication of Judge's Order, #12 Exhibit B.9-Address of Johnathon Westreich, #13 Exhibit B.10-Carloz Diaz, #14 Exhibit B.11-Change of Physical Address, #15 Exhibit B.11-Changes to Website, #16 Attachment A-History & Overview of Defendant Wiggen, #17 Attachment B-History & Overview of Defendant Wiggen & Mugshot, #18 Attachment C-History & Overview of Wiggen & Ripeoff Report) (CS)
February 11, 2019 Filing 7 Response to #5 ORDER filed by Samir El-Hosseiny. (CS)
February 7, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Craig Robert Wiggen. (CS)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER, Clerk is directed to issue summons to Craig Robert Wiggen. The USM shall serve the Defendant and shall file the return summons. Plaintiff is directed to provide a physical address and name of an agent for service of process for arrest.org by February 15, 2019 or arrest.org may be dismissed from this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 02/07/2019. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff] (CS)
February 4, 2019 Filing 4 Response to #3 ORDER filed by Samir El-Hosseiny. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A-Name of Owner & Addresses) (CS)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on January 23, 2019. (MMc)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Samir El-Hosseiny. (CS)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Arrests.org, Craig Robert Wiggen, filed by Samir El-Hosseiny. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Addendum, #3 Attachment 1-Statements & Ads, #4 Attachment 2-Case Dissmisal, #5 Attachment 3-Notes re Discovery, #6 Attachment 4-Texts of Defendant's Webpage, #7 Attachment 5-Hyperlink, #8 Attachment 6-Bing URL, #9 Attachment 7-Yahoo Search, #10 Attachment 8-Landing Page of Plaintiff, #11 Attachment 9-Emails, #12 Attachment 10-Preview Texts, #13 Appendix 1-Arizona-False Light, #14 Attachment A-Emails) (CS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: El-Hosseiny v. Wiggen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arrests.org
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Robert Wiggen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samir El-Hosseiny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?