Shifalo v. Okyanos Operating Company, Ltd. et al

Plaintiff: Lauren Hood Shifalo
Defendant: Bart Rademaker, M.D., Okyanos Operating Company, Ltd. and John Does 1-5
Case Number: 2:2019cv00052
Filed: April 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael T Parker
Referring Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Regarding Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on June 24, 2019 (KPM)
June 24, 2019 Set Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 7/29/2019 9:30 AM in Courtroom 2, U.S. Courthouse, 701 N. Main Street, Hattiesburg, MS before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker. Counsel, the parties, and representatives with full settlement authority must be present. Confidential settlement memoranda are due on or before 7/23/19. (KPM)
June 14, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 Response to #7 Motion, filed by Okyanos Operating Company, Ltd., Bart Rademaker, MD (Lollar, Blythe)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #7 Joint MOTION to Dismiss . The motion is granted. The reply is due on or before June 14, 2019. No further order will issue. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 6/5/19. (cb)
June 4, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Okyanos Operating Company, Ltd., Bart Rademaker, MD (Lollar, Blythe)
June 4, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lauren Hood Shifalo. Okyanos Operating Company, Ltd. served on 5/3/2019, answer due 5/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A"- Affidavit of Service)(Comley, Hugh)
May 31, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by Lauren Hood Shifalo (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Declaration of Dr. Carlin, #2 Exhibit B Declaration of Lauren Shifalo, #3 Exhibit C Declaration of Dr. Thornton, #4 Exhibit D Declaration of Michael Ulmer, #5 Exhibit E Okyanos Our Staff Website)(Ulmer, Michael)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER staying discovery and disclosure requirements pending a ruling on the motion to dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on May 29, 2019 (KPM)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #7 Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by Okyanos Operating Company, Ltd., Bart Rademaker, M.D. Response due 5/31/19; reply due 6/7/19. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 5/23/19. (cb)
May 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley W. Smith on behalf of Okyanos Operating Company, Ltd., Bart Rademaker, MD (Smith, Bradley)
May 17, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by Okyanos Operating Company, Ltd., Bart Rademaker, MD (Lollar, Blythe)
May 17, 2019 Filing 7 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Okyanos Operating Company, Ltd., Bart Rademaker, MD (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Vincent Burton, M.D., #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Bart Rademaker, M.D.)(Lollar, Blythe)
May 7, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lauren Hood Shifalo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Affidavit of Process Server)(Comley, Hugh)
May 7, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #5 : Proof of Service of a summons should be completed and filed with the first page, as issued. Attachment of Affidavit of Process Server is not sufficient without completed proof. Attorney is directed to refile and may attach the Affidavit as an exhibit. (CS)
May 6, 2019 Filing 5 **ERROR DISREGARD THIS ENTRY** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lauren Hood Shifalo. Bart Rademaker, MD served on 4/26/2019, answer due 5/17/2019. (Comley, Hugh) Modified on 5/7/2019 (CS).
April 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy L. Sensing on behalf of Lauren Hood Shifalo (Sensing, Timothy)
April 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W. Ulmer on behalf of Lauren Hood Shifalo (Ulmer, Michael)
April 8, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Okyanos Operating Company, Ltd., Bart Rademaker, MD. (CS)
April 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Does 1-5, Okyanos Operating Company, Ltd., Bart Rademaker, MD (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0538-3960734), filed by Lauren Hood Shifalo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-Notice of Claim, #3 Exhibit B-Fed Ex Delivery Confirmation, #4 Exhibit C-Certified Mail Receipt) (CS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shifalo v. Okyanos Operating Company, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bart Rademaker, M.D.
Represented By: Blythe K. Lollar
Represented By: Bradley W. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Okyanos Operating Company, Ltd.
Represented By: Blythe K. Lollar
Represented By: Bradley W. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Hood Shifalo
Represented By: Hugh Ruston Comley
Represented By: Michael W. Ulmer
Represented By: Timothy L. Sensing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?