Village at the Beverly, LLC v. Empire Corporation of Tennessee, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Village at the Beverly, LLC
Defendant: Michael T. Sullivan, LRK, Inc., Superior Insulation of the Gulf Coast, LLC and Loan Oak Construction
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Empire Corporation of Tennessee, Inc.
3Rd Party Defendant: NV Construction LLC and Bigford Enterprises, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00055
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael T Parker
Referring Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 33 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Loan Oak Construction (Burson, Richard)
June 26, 2019 Filing 32 ANSWER to #17 Answer to Complaint,, Third Party Complaint, by Loan Oak Construction.(Burson, Richard)
June 24, 2019 Filing 31 ANSWER to #17 Answer to Complaint,, Third Party Complaint, by Bigford Enterprises, Inc..(Smith, Roy)
June 24, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Brantley Adams on behalf of Bigford Enterprises, Inc. (Adams, Robert)
June 24, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Roy A. Smith, Jr on behalf of Bigford Enterprises, Inc. (Smith, Roy)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Stay Proceedings; granting #14 Motion to Compel Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 6/18/19 (lm)
June 12, 2019 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Empire Corporation of Tennessee, Inc.. Bigford Enterprises, Inc. served on 6/3/2019, answer due 6/25/2019. (Ledford, Leah)
June 11, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #25 : Proof of Service of a summons should be completed and filed with the first page, as issued. Attachment of an Affidavit of Service is not sufficient without completed proof. Attorney is directed to refile. (LDR)
June 11, 2019 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Empire Corporation of Tennessee, Inc.. NV Construction LLC served on 5/30/2019, answer due 6/20/2019. (Ledford, Leah)
June 11, 2019 Filing 25 **ERROR, DISREGARD THIS ENTRY** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Empire Corporation of Tennessee, Inc.. Bigford Enterprises, Inc. served on 6/4/2019, answer due 6/25/2019. (Ledford, Leah) Modified on 6/11/2019 (LDR).
June 11, 2019 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Empire Corporation of Tennessee, Inc.. Loan Oak Construction served on 6/4/2019, answer due 6/25/2019. (Ledford, Leah)
May 31, 2019 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Empire Corporation of Tennessee, Inc.. Superior Insulation of the Gulf Coast, LLC served on 5/30/2019, answer due 6/20/2019. (Ledford, Leah)
May 28, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Support re #14 MOTION to Stay Proceedings MOTION to Compel filed by Village at the Beverly, LLC (Bailey, Cody)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER staying discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on May 24, 2019. (js)
May 22, 2019 Filing 20 Summons On A Third Party Complaint Issued as to Loan Oak Construction, Superior Insulation of the Gulf Coast, LLC. (CS)
May 21, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #18 Response to Motion filed by Empire Corporation of Tennessee, Inc. (Ledford, Leah)
May 21, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #14 MOTION to Stay Proceedings MOTION to Compel filed by Empire Corporation of Tennessee, Inc. (Ledford, Leah)
May 14, 2019 Filing 17 Amended ANSWER to Complaint and, Second THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Bigford Enterprises, Inc., NV Construction LLC, Loan Oak Construction, Superior Insulation of the Gulf Coast, LLC by Empire Corporation of Tennessee, Inc..(Ledford, Leah)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re #14 MOTION to Stay Proceedings MOTION to Compel filed by Village at the Beverly, LLC. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 5/8/2019. (lm)
May 7, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support re #14 MOTION to Stay Proceedings MOTION to Compel filed by Village at the Beverly, LLC (Bailey, Cody)
May 7, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Stay Proceedings , MOTION to Compel by Village at the Beverly, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Contract with Empire, #2 Exhibit B - Terms and Conditions, #3 Exhibit C - Contract with Sullivan/LRK, #4 Exhibit D - LRK Letter, #5 Exhibit E - LRK Invoices to VATB, #6 Exhibit F - Demand for Mediation and Arbitration w/o Exhibits)(Bailey, Cody)
April 30, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Empire Corporation of Tennessee, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Empire Holding Company for Empire Corporation of Tennessee, Inc.. (Ledford, Leah)
April 30, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to NV Construction LLC. (LDR)
April 30, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Bigford Enterprises, Inc. (LDR)
April 25, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LRK, Inc. (Patronas, Patrick)
April 24, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by LRK, Inc., Michael T. Sullivan.(Patronas, Patrick)
April 24, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against NV Construction LLC, Bigford Enterprises, Inc. by Empire Corporation of Tennessee, Inc..(Ledford, Leah)
April 24, 2019 Filing 7 State Court Record by Defendant Empire Corporation of Tennessee, Inc. Volumes 1 (Ledford, Leah)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. LRK, Inc. answer due 4/24/2019; Michael T. Sullivan answer due 4/24/2019. No further written order shall issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on April 16, 2019. (js)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Empire Corporation of Tennessee, Inc. answer due 4/24/2019. No further written order shall issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on April 16, 2019. (js)
April 16, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by LRK, Inc., Michael T. Sullivan (Patronas, Patrick)
April 16, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Empire Corporation of Tennessee, Inc. (Ledford, Leah)
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob A. Bradley on behalf of Village at the Beverly, LLC (Bradley, Jacob)
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie M. Hand on behalf of LRK, Inc., Michael T. Sullivan (Hand, Leslie)
April 11, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #2 : Since a Notice of Appearance by attorney was not previously filed, the attorney is advised in the future when making an appearance in a case to add himself/herself to the appropriate party and to make sure the correct party/attorney association is made, or in the alternative to file a Notice of Appearance. Correction has been made. (LDR)
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Consent to Removal by LRK, Inc., Michael T. Sullivan re #1 Notice of Removal,,, (Patronas, Patrick)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Empire Corporation of Tennessee, Inc. from Circuit Court of Forrest County, MS, case number W19-0034. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-3963840) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #3 State Court Summons - Empire Corporation)(LDR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Village at the Beverly, LLC v. Empire Corporation of Tennessee, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael T. Sullivan
Represented By: Patrick Patronas
Represented By: Leslie M. Hand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LRK, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick Patronas
Represented By: Leslie M. Hand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Insulation of the Gulf Coast, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loan Oak Construction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village at the Beverly, LLC
Represented By: Cody C. Bailey
Represented By: Jacob A. Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Empire Corporation of Tennessee, Inc.
Represented By: Leah Nichols Ledford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: NV Construction LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Bigford Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Brantley Adams
Represented By: Roy A. Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?