Ramirez v. Medical Staff et al
Plaintiff: Ramon Ramirez
Defendant: Forrest County Correction Officers, Forrest Co. Jail and Medical Staff
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 2:2019cv00075
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael T Parker
Referring Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, on or before July 12, 2019, the Plaintiff shall file a written response showing cause why this case should not be dismissed for his failure to comply with a Court Order. Show Cause Response due by 7/12/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 6/27/2019 [Copy mailed to plaintiff] (LDR)
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 AUTHORIZATION FOR RELEASE OF ACCOUNT INFORMATION AND CERTIFICATE by Ramon Ramirez. (LDR) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/30/2019: #1 Envelope) (LDR).
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER, on or before June 13, 2019, plaintiff shall either pay the required filing fee or file a completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, specifically the section entitled Certificate to Be Completed by Authorized Officer of prisoner accounts or file an affidavit specifically stating the name of the prison official contacted concerning the Certificate and why this information is not provided to this court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 5/14/2019. [Copy mailed to plaintiff] (LDR)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 6/14/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 5/14/2019. [Copy mailed to plaintiff] (LDR)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 Letter from Ramon Ramirez regarding the authorization for financial information. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (LDR)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Ramon Ramirez. (LDR)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Forrest Co. Jail, Forrest County Correction Officers, Medical Staff, filed by Ramon Ramirez. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Notice of Assignment)(LDR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramirez v. Medical Staff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forrest County Correction Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forrest Co. Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?