Backstrom v. Truvision Health,LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Ashley Backstrom
Defendant: Truvision Health Logistics, Inc., Truvision Health, LLC., Terri Tew and XYZ Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv00080
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael T Parker
Referring Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #1 : Truvision Health Logistics, Inc. added as defendant in error. Pursuant to State Court Amended Complaint proper party defendants are Truvision Health, LLC, XYZ Corporation and Terri Tew. (LDR)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 7/25/2019 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker. Counsel shall dial 1.888.273.3658, code 1055457 to connect to the call. Confidential settlement memoranda are due on or before 7/19/19. (KPM)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Truvision Health, LLC..(Gregory, Samuel)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Truvision Health, LLC. (Gregory, Samuel)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Lewis Champagne on behalf of Truvision Health, LLC. (Champagne, Amy)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Truvision Health, LLC. from Circuit Court of Perry County, Mississippi, case number 56CI1:18-cv-65. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-3992003) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #3 Exhibit B - Collection of Declarations)(LDR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Backstrom v. Truvision Health,LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Truvision Health Logistics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Truvision Health, LLC.
Represented By: Amy Lewis Champagne
Represented By: Samuel D. Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terri Tew
Represented By: B. W. Curry, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Backstrom
Represented By: George W. Schmidt, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?