United States of America v. Winchester 1873 Rifle, CAL:32, SN: 587304B et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Winchester 1873 Rifle, CAL:32, SN: 587304B, 1183 Rounds Assorted Ammunition, CAL: 556, Remington Arms Company,Inc. 870 Express Mag Shotgun, CAL: 12, SN: B227488M, 2752 Component Assorted Ammunition, CAL: Multi, Winchester 1300 Defender Shotgun, CAL: 12, SN: L3210094, Norinco (North China Industries) 56 Machine Gun, CAL762, SN:9005048, 175 Rounds Assorted Ammunition, CAL: Multi, 6 Containers of Tannerite, Harrington and Richardson Unknown Rifle, CAL: Unknown, SN: HX365127, Hopkins And Allen Unknown Shotgun, CAL: 12, SN: 253165, Keltec, CNC Industries,Inc. KSG Shotgun, CAL: 12, SN: XWU89, Smokeless Powder, Remington Arms Company, Inc. 700 Rifle, CAL: 308, SN: G7129545, Ammunition Primers, Remington Arms Company, Inc.552 Rifle, CAL: 22, SN: A1943377, Walther P88 Compact Pistol, CAL: 9, SN: 104204, 2162 Rounds Assorted Ammunition, CAL: Multi, Savage 987 Rifle, CAL: 22, SN: D788186, Ruger Mark II Pistol, CAL: 22, SN: 17-47090, 37 Rounds Assorted Ammunition, CAL: Multi, Coastal Guns Unknown Silencer, CAL: Unknown, SN: G212-002, 315 Rounds Assorted Ammunition, CAL: Multi, Spike's Tactical LLC SL15 Rifle Receiver/Frame, CAL: Multi SN: NSL065694, Smith & Wesson 66 Revolver, CAL: 357, SN: 4K43, Safety Fuse, Browning Challenger Pistol, CAL: 22, SN: 57563P6, Sig-Sauer P226Pistol, CAL: 9, SN: U521080, Winchester 94 Golden Spike Rifle, CAL: 30-30, SN: GS53203, Smith & Wesson Bodyguard Revolver, CAL: 38, SN: CSX7361, Ruger Mark II Pistol, CAL: 22, SN: 274071, Colt Combat Commander Pistol, CAL: 9, SN: 70SC27518, 41 Rounds Assorted Ammunition, CAL: Unknown, Winchester 94 Rifle, CAL: 30-30, SN: 2438431, Rossi 92 SRC Rifle, CAL:44, SN:M042749, Winchester 120 Ranger Shotgun, CAL: 20, SN: L1559283, 248 Rounds Assorted Ammunition, CAL:762 and Colt AR15 Machine Gun, CAL: 223, SN: 905735
Case Number: 2:2019cv00082
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael T Parker
Referring Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Wesley Webb-Federal Gov on behalf of United States of America (Webb-Federal Gov, J.)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #6 Motion to Stay Proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on June 28, 2019. (MMc)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by United States of America (Perez-Federal Gov, Marc)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Winchester 1873 Rifle, CAL:32, SN: 587304B (Dukes, James)
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM Returned Executed. (CS)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 Warrant of Arrest In Rem Issued for United States of America. (CS)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America re #1 Complaint. (Perez-Federal Gov, Marc)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM by United States of America (Perez-Federal Gov, Marc)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 1183 Rounds Assorted Ammunition, CAL: 556, 175 Rounds Assorted Ammunition, CAL: Multi, 2162 Rounds Assorted Ammunition, CAL: Multi, 248 Rounds Assorted Ammunition, CAL:762, 2752 Component Assorted Ammunition, CAL: Multi, 315 Rounds Assorted Ammunition, CAL: Multi, 37 Rounds Assorted Ammunition, CAL: Multi, 41 Rounds Assorted Ammunition, CAL: Unknown, 6 Containers of Tannerite, Ammunition Primers, Browning Challenger Pistol, CAL: 22, SN: 57563P6, Coastal Guns Unknown Silencer, CAL: Unknown, SN: G212-002, Colt AR15 Machine Gun, CAL: 223, SN: 905735, Colt Combat Commander Pistol, CAL: 9, SN: 70SC27518, Harrington and Richardson Unknown Rifle, CAL: Unknown, SN: HX365127, Hopkins And Allen Unknown Shotgun, CAL: 12, SN: 253165, Keltec, CNC Industries,Inc. KSG Shotgun, CAL: 12, SN: XWU89, Norinco (North China Industries) 56 Machine Gun, CAL762, SN:9005048, Remington Arms Company, Inc. 700 Rifle, CAL: 308, SN: G7129545, Remington Arms Company, Inc.552 Rifle, CAL: 22, SN: A1943377, Remington Arms Company,Inc. 870 Express Mag Shotgun, CAL: 12, SN: B227488M, Rossi 92 SRC Rifle, CAL:44, SN:M042749, Ruger Mark II Pistol, CAL: 22, SN: 17-47090, Ruger Mark II Pistol, CAL: 22, SN: 274071, Safety Fuse, Savage 987 Rifle, CAL: 22, SN: D788186, Sig-Sauer P226Pistol, CAL: 9, SN: U521080, Smith & Wesson 66 Revolver, CAL: 357, SN: 4K43, Smith & Wesson Bodyguard Revolver, CAL: 38, SN: CSX7361, Smokeless Powder, Spike's Tactical LLC SL15 Rifle Receiver/Frame, CAL: Multi SN: NSL065694, Walther P88 Compact Pistol, CAL: 9, SN: 104204, Winchester 120 Ranger Shotgun, CAL: 20, SN: L1559283, Winchester 1300 Defender Shotgun, CAL: 12, SN: L3210094, Winchester 1873 Rifle, CAL:32, SN: 587304B, Winchester 94 Golden Spike Rifle, CAL: 30-30, SN: GS53203, Winchester 94 Rifle, CAL: 30-30, SN: 2438431, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-Declaration) (CS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Winchester 1873 Rifle, CAL:32, SN: 587304B et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winchester 1873 Rifle, CAL:32, SN: 587304B
Represented By: James K. Dukes, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1183 Rounds Assorted Ammunition, CAL: 556
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Remington Arms Company,Inc. 870 Express Mag Shotgun, CAL: 12, SN: B227488M
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2752 Component Assorted Ammunition, CAL: Multi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winchester 1300 Defender Shotgun, CAL: 12, SN: L3210094
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norinco (North China Industries) 56 Machine Gun, CAL762, SN:9005048
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 175 Rounds Assorted Ammunition, CAL: Multi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 6 Containers of Tannerite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harrington and Richardson Unknown Rifle, CAL: Unknown, SN: HX365127
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hopkins And Allen Unknown Shotgun, CAL: 12, SN: 253165
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keltec, CNC Industries,Inc. KSG Shotgun, CAL: 12, SN: XWU89
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smokeless Powder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Remington Arms Company, Inc. 700 Rifle, CAL: 308, SN: G7129545
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ammunition Primers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Remington Arms Company, Inc.552 Rifle, CAL: 22, SN: A1943377
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walther P88 Compact Pistol, CAL: 9, SN: 104204
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2162 Rounds Assorted Ammunition, CAL: Multi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Savage 987 Rifle, CAL: 22, SN: D788186
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruger Mark II Pistol, CAL: 22, SN: 17-47090
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 37 Rounds Assorted Ammunition, CAL: Multi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coastal Guns Unknown Silencer, CAL: Unknown, SN: G212-002
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 315 Rounds Assorted Ammunition, CAL: Multi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spike's Tactical LLC SL15 Rifle Receiver/Frame, CAL: Multi SN: NSL065694
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith & Wesson 66 Revolver, CAL: 357, SN: 4K43
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safety Fuse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Browning Challenger Pistol, CAL: 22, SN: 57563P6
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sig-Sauer P226Pistol, CAL: 9, SN: U521080
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winchester 94 Golden Spike Rifle, CAL: 30-30, SN: GS53203
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith & Wesson Bodyguard Revolver, CAL: 38, SN: CSX7361
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruger Mark II Pistol, CAL: 22, SN: 274071
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colt Combat Commander Pistol, CAL: 9, SN: 70SC27518
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 41 Rounds Assorted Ammunition, CAL: Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winchester 94 Rifle, CAL: 30-30, SN: 2438431
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rossi 92 SRC Rifle, CAL:44, SN:M042749
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winchester 120 Ranger Shotgun, CAL: 20, SN: L1559283
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 248 Rounds Assorted Ammunition, CAL:762
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colt AR15 Machine Gun, CAL: 223, SN: 905735
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Marc A. Perez-Federal Gov
Represented By: J. Wesley Webb-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?