Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company v. Wells et al
Plaintiff: Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Defendant: Ronald Wells, Sherry Bateman, Linda Wells and George Wells
Case Number: 2:2019cv00099
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael T Parker
Referring Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Reset Hearings: Telephonic Case Management Conference reset for 10/1/2019 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker. Counsel shall dial 888.273.3658, code 1055457 to connect to the call. Confidential settlement memoranda are due on or before 9/27/19. (KPM)
August 28, 2019 Filing 19 Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 10/3/2019 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker. Counsel shall dial 888.273.3658, code 1055457 to connect to the call. Confidential settlement memoranda are due on or before 9/27/19.(KPM)
August 27, 2019 Filing 18 Cross COUNTERCLAIM against Linda Wells, filed by George Wells, Ronald Wells, Sherry Bateman.(Jones, William)
August 26, 2019 Filing 17 Defendants ANSWER to #3 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim and Defenses of Linda Wells by Sherry Bateman, George Wells, Ronald Wells.(Jones, William)
August 26, 2019 Filing 16 Defendants ANSWER to #1 Complaint, for Interpleader and Declaratory Judgment by Sherry Bateman, George Wells, Ronald Wells.(Jones, William)
August 21, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Linda Wells. Sherry Bateman served on 8/16/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. (Nelson, Ned)
August 16, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #3 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim by Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company.(Cookston, Steven)
August 15, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #13 : This docket entry fails to select all filing parties. Clerks office will edit this docket entry to include all appropriate filing parties. Attorney is directed to select all filing parties in future filings. (LDR)
August 14, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by William H. Jones on behalf of Ronald Wells, Sherry Bateman, George Wells. (Jones, William) Modified on 8/15/2019 (LDR).
August 5, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Reissued re Cross-Claim in a Lawsuit as to Sherry Bateman. (LDR)
August 5, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Linda Wells as to Sherry Bateman. (Nelson, Mark)
July 29, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Linda Wells. Ronald Wells served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. (Nelson, Ned)
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Linda Wells. George Wells served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. (Nelson, Ned)
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Reissued as to Sherry Bateman. (LDR)
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 Letter from Upshaw Williams requesting re-issuance of Summons for defendant Sherry Bateman (LDR)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Sherry Bateman, George Wells, Ronald Wells. (LDR)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued re cross-claim as to Sherry Bateman, George Wells, Ronald Wells. (LDR)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A. Nelson on behalf of Linda Wells (Nelson, Mark)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against George Wells, Ronald Wells, Sherry Bateman, COUNTERCLAIM against Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company by Linda Wells.(Nelson, Ned)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Ned Andrew Nelson on behalf of Linda Wells (Nelson, Ned)
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Interpleader and Declaratory Judgment against Sherry Bateman, George Wells, Linda Wells, Ronald Wells (Filing fee $400 receipt number 24643006314), filed by Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-Policy Declarations Pages and Sample Policy, #3 Exhibit B-Last Will and Testament of Jerry T. Wells, #4 Exhibit C-May 2, 2019 and May 31, 2019 Correspondence) (CS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company v. Wells et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Wells
Represented By: William H. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherry Bateman
Represented By: William H. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Wells
Represented By: Mark A. Nelson
Represented By: Ned Andrew Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Wells
Represented By: William H. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Steven C. Cookston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?