Myers v. Legacy Equipment Inc. et al
Plaintiff: David W. Myers
Defendant: James C. Passeau, G.A. West & Co., Inc., Legacy Equipment Inc. and Illinois Central Railroad Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00100
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael T Parker
Referring Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER re #25 MOTION to Strike #16 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim Settlement Allegations pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) filed by G.A. West & Co., Inc., James C. Passeau, Legacy Equipment Inc. Response due 9/18/19; reply due 9/25/19. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 9/5/19. (cb)
September 4, 2019 Filing 27 ANSWER to #16 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , CROSSCLAIM against Illinois Central Railroad Company by Legacy Equipment Inc., James C. Passeau, G.A. West & Co., Inc..(Biggers, Matthew)
September 4, 2019 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM in Support re #25 MOTION to Strike #16 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim Settlement Allegations pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) filed by G.A. West & Co., Inc., Legacy Equipment Inc., James C. Passeau (Biggers, Matthew)
September 4, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Strike #16 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim Settlement Allegations pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) by G.A. West & Co., Inc., Legacy Equipment Inc., James C. Passeau (Biggers, Matthew)
August 23, 2019 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Punitive Damages Claims filed by G.A. West & Co., Inc., Legacy Equipment Inc. (Biggers, Matthew)
August 19, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Poolson, Jr on behalf of David W. Myers (Poolson, Daniel)
August 19, 2019 Rule 16(a) order mailed to Carisa Renee German-Oden - PHV (KPM)
August 16, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Carisa Renee German-Oden - PHV on behalf of David W. Myers (German-Oden - PHV, Carisa)
August 16, 2019 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Support re #20 Response to Motion filed by David W. Myers (German-Oden - PHV, Carisa)
August 16, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Punitive Damages Claims filed by David W. Myers (German-Oden - PHV, Carisa)
August 15, 2019 Rule 16(a) order e-mailed to Benjamin B. Morgan, Peeler Grayson Lacey, Jr (KPM)
August 15, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin B. Morgan on behalf of Illinois Central Railroad Company (Morgan, Benjamin)
August 15, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Peeler Grayson Lacey, Jr on behalf of Illinois Central Railroad Company (Lacey, Peeler)
August 15, 2019 Filing 17 Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 10/3/2019 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker. Counsel shall dial 1.888.273.3658, code 1055457 to connect to the call. Confidential settlement memoranda are due on or before 9/27/19. (KPM)
August 14, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against G.A. West & Co., Inc., Legacy Equipment Inc., James C. Passeau by Illinois Central Railroad Company.(Entrekin, Romney)
August 13, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin B. Saunders - PHV on behalf of David W. Myers (Saunders - PHV, Benjamin)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Punitive Damages Claims filed by G.A. West & Co., Inc., Legacy Equipment Inc. Response due 8/16/19; reply due 8/23/19. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 8/5/19. (cb)
August 2, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David W. Myers. James C. Passeau served on 8/2/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. (Rath, Bradley)
August 2, 2019 Filing 12 Joint ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by G.A. West & Co., Inc., Legacy Equipment Inc., James C. Passeau.(Biggers, Matthew)
August 2, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Punitive Damages Claims filed by G.A. West & Co., Inc., Legacy Equipment Inc. (Biggers, Matthew)
August 2, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Punitive Damages Claims by G.A. West & Co., Inc., Legacy Equipment Inc. (Biggers, Matthew)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #9 Unopposed Motion to Extend Responsive Pleading Deadline. Illinois Central Railroad Company's answer is due by 8/14/19. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on July 31, 2019 (KPM)
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Responsive Pleading Deadline by Illinois Central Railroad Company (Morgan, Benjamin)
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by G.A. West & Co., Inc., Legacy Equipment Inc., James C. Passeau.(Quinlivan, Lawrence)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Carisa Renee German-Oden is hereby admitted pro hac vice upon registering for electronic filing. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on July 19, 2019 (KPM)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Carisa Renee German-Oden to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4038294) by David W. Myers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Certificate of Good Standing-Carisa Renee German-Oden, Esq.)(Rath, Bradley)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David W. Myers. Legacy Equipment Inc. served on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019. (Rath, Bradley)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David W. Myers. G.A. West & Co., Inc. served on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019. (Rath, Bradley)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David W. Myers. Illinois Central Railroad Company served on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019. (Rath, Bradley)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Benjamin Burt Saunders is hereby admitted pro hac vice upon registering for electronic filing. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on July 15, 2019 (KPM)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Benjamin Burt Saunders to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4034461) by David W. Myers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Certificate of Good Standing-Benjamin Burt Saunders)(Rath, Bradley)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to G.A. West & Co., Inc., Illinois Central Railroad Company, Legacy Equipment Inc., James C. Passeau. (CS)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against G.A. West & Co., Inc., Illinois Central Railroad Company, Legacy Equipment Inc., James C. Passeau (Filing fee $400 receipt number 24643006324), filed by David W. Myers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (CS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Myers v. Legacy Equipment Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James C. Passeau
Represented By: Lawrence M. Quinlivan
Represented By: Matthew T. Biggers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G.A. West & Co., Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Quinlivan
Represented By: Matthew T. Biggers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legacy Equipment Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Quinlivan
Represented By: Matthew T. Biggers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois Central Railroad Company
Represented By: Romney H. Entrekin
Represented By: Benjamin B. Morgan
Represented By: Peeler Grayson Lacey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David W. Myers
Represented By: Bradley W. Rath
Represented By: Benjamin B. Saunders - PHV
Represented By: Daniel J. Poolson, Jr.
Represented By: Carisa Renee German-Oden - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?