Siggers v. Forrest County, Mississippi
Plaintiff: Clifton Lee Siggers
Defendant: Forrest County Jail, Forrest County, Mississippi, Marcol Smith, Elias Lover and Justin Graham
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 2:2019cv00104
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael T Parker
Referring Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying #15 Motion to Produce. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on September 3, 2019. (MMc)
August 29, 2019 Filing 22 Letter from Clifton Lee Siggers requesting Court to review #15 Motion. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (CS)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER, Clerk is directed to edit the short title of the instant civil action to Siggers v. Forrest County, Mississippi. Clerk shall edit Defendant CO #24 to Justin Graham, C.O. #24 and CO #60 to Marcol Smith, C.O. #60. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 08/20/2019. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff] (CS)
August 20, 2019 Filing 20 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Elias Lover, Correctional Officer #71, formerly employed by Forrest County, Mississippi on 08/20/2019. Waiver of Service due by 9/20/2019. (CS)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER, Clerk shall edit the name of Defendant CO #71 to Elias Lover, Correctional Officer #71 formerly employed by Forrest County, Mississippi. Clerk is directed to issue a Notice of Lawsuit for Defendant Elias Lover and send via first class mail to Elias Lover at the address provided in the Sealed Document #18 . The Defendant is directed to file a signed Waiver form within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 08/20/2019. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff] (Attachments: #1 Notice of Lawsuit, #2 Waiver of Service) (CS)
August 19, 2019 Filing 18 Sealed Document RE: #12 Order. (CS)
August 16, 2019 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by C.O. #60, C.O. #24. C.O. #60 waiver sent on 8/6/2019, answer due 10/7/2019; C.O. #24 waiver sent on 8/6/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Allen, William)
August 16, 2019 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Forrest County, Mississippi. Forrest County, Mississippi waiver sent on 8/6/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Allen, William)
August 14, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Subpoena Incident Report and Video by Clifton Lee Siggers. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (CS)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER, the Court hereby refers this cause to United States Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker for all further proceedings to include conducting hearings and submitting to the district judge assigned to this cause proposed findings of fact and recommendations for the disposition of this cause. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 08/09/2019. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff] (CS)
August 6, 2019 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Forrest County, Mississippi, C.O. #60, C.O. #71, C.O. #24 on 08/06/2019. Waiver of Service due by 9/6/2019. (CS)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER, Clerk is directed to issue a Notice of Lawsuit for Defendants. The Defendants are directed to file a signed Waiver form within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 08/06/2019. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff] (Attachments: #1 Notice of Lawsuit, #2 Waiver of Service) (CS)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, Clerk is directed to add as Defendants the following: Forrest County, Mississippi; C.O. #60; C.O. #71; and C.O. #24. Court will construe Plaintiff's request to "drop Forrest County Jail" as a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Forrest County Jail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 08/06/2019. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff] (CS)
August 2, 2019 Filing 10 Response to #9 ORDER filed by Clifton Lee Siggers. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (CS)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, on or before August 16, 2019, Plaintiff shall file a written response consistent with this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 07/25/2019. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff] (CS)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 , #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and setting payment schedule as set forth in Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 07/25/2019. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff and Forrest County Sheriff's Office] (CS)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Clifton Lee Siggers. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (CS)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 Acknowledgment of Receipt as to #3 Order Opsp2. Acknowledgement filed by Clifton Lee Siggers. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (CS)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 AUTHORIZATION FOR RELEASE OF ACCOUNT INFORMATION AND CERTIFICATE by Clifton Lee Siggers. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (CS)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The plaintiff shall file within 30 days of the date of this order a completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, specifically the section entitled Certificate to Be Completed by Authorized Officer of prisoner accounts or file an affidavit specifically stating the name of the prison official contacted concerning the Certificate and why this information is not provided to this court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 07/15/2019. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff] (CS)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed to Plaintiff. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 8/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 07/16/2019. (CS)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Clifton Lee Siggers. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (CS)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Forrest County Jail, filed by Clifton Lee Siggers. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Assignment, #2 Envelope) (CS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Siggers v. Forrest County, Mississippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forrest County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forrest County, Mississippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcol Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elias Lover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifton Lee Siggers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?