Jackson v. Low Construction Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jeremy D. Jackson
Defendant: David Airhart, Jr. and Low Construction Group, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00130
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael T Parker
Referring Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 6 Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 12/12/2019 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker. Counsel shall dial 1.888.273.3658, code 1055457 to connect to the call. Confidential settlement memoranda are due on or before 12/6/19. (KPM)
November 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy J. Sterling on behalf of David Airhart, Jr, Low Construction Group, LLC (Sterling, Timothy)
November 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Greg Copeland on behalf of David Airhart, Jr, Low Construction Group, LLC (Copeland, Charles)
October 31, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Defenses by David Airhart, Jr, Low Construction Group, LLC.(Hillery, Lauren)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to David Airhart, Jr., Low Construction Group, LLC. (CS)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David Airhart, Jr, Low Construction Group, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 24643006423), filed by Jeremy D. Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LDR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Low Construction Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Airhart, Jr.
Represented By: Charles Greg Copeland
Represented By: Timothy J. Sterling
Represented By: Lauren R. Hillery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Low Construction Group, LLC
Represented By: Charles Greg Copeland
Represented By: Timothy J. Sterling
Represented By: Lauren R. Hillery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy D. Jackson
Represented By: Christopher J. Weldy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?