Daniel Health Care, Inc. v. Harden
Plaintiff: Daniel Health Care, Inc.
Defendant: Joy Beth Harden
Case Number: 2:2019cv00146
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael T Parker
Referring Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Daniel Health Care, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Orders, #2 Exhibit Sworn Declaration of Joy Beth Harden)(Self, Marjorie)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting in part #9 Motion to Extend TRO. The Court grants the motion insofar as it requests an extension of the TRO. The Court extends the TRO for an additional fourteen days. The Court denies the motion in all other respects. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 10/17/19. (cb)
October 17, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Motion to Extend Temporary Restraining Order, To Set Hearing on Preliminary Injunction and to Consolidate Preliminary Injunction With Trial on the Merits, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , MOTION to Extend Temporary Restraining Order Deadline by Daniel Health Care, Inc. (Self, Marjorie)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for TRO; denying #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The Court grants the motion for a TRO, but denies the request for a preliminary injunction. The TRO will expire 14 days after its entry. The Court waives the bond requirement. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 10/8/19. (cb)
October 8, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #6 : Multiple motions filed under one motion event. This document requests several motion reliefs. Every motion relief should be selected from the list of motion titles or each relief docketed separately. The same PDF document may be used for all motion filing entries. It is not necessary to refile as court staff has made the necessary correction. Attorney is advised to follow this procedure in future filings. (LDR)
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction filed by Daniel Health Care, Inc. (Self, Marjorie)
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction by Daniel Health Care, Inc. (Self, Marjorie). Added MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on 10/8/2019 (LDR).
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel Health Care, Inc.. Joy Beth Harden served on 10/3/2019, answer due 10/24/2019. (Self, Marjorie)
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Mark Wann on behalf of Daniel Health Care, Inc. (Wann, Steven)
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly H. Stringer on behalf of Daniel Health Care, Inc. (Stringer, Kelly)
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Joy Beth Harden. (LDR)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Joy Beth Harden (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 24643006458), filed by Daniel Health Care, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LDR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daniel Health Care, Inc. v. Harden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Health Care, Inc.
Represented By: Marjorie Selby Self
Represented By: Kelly H. Stringer
Represented By: Steven Mark Wann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joy Beth Harden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?