BNJ Leasing, Inc. et al v. Portabull Fuel Service, LLC
Plaintiff: MRB Enterprise Inc. and BNJ Leasing, Inc.
Defendant: Portabull Fuel Service, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00156
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael T Parker
Referring Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Portabull Fuel Service, LLC answer due 12/23/2019. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on November 20, 2019 (KPM)
November 20, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Portabull Fuel Service, LLC (Zachary, Patrick)
November 6, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BNJ Leasing, Inc., MRB Enterprise Inc.. Portabull Fuel Service, LLC served on 10/31/2019, answer due 11/21/2019. (Dyal, Jonathan)
October 21, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee paid by David P. Utykanski $ 100, receipt number 24643006490. (LDR)
October 21, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee paid by Brent G. Seitz $ 100, receipt number 24643006489. (LDR)
October 21, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Portabull Fuel Service, LLC. (LDR)
October 18, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to [1-4]: Incorrect Division listed. Attorney is advised to use new division name "Eastern Division" in future filings. (LDR)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Brent Seitz and David Utykanski are hereby admitted pro hac vice upon payment of the pro hac admission fee and registering for electronic filing. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on October 18, 2019 (KPM)
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF MAILING OF Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a patent or trademark by BNJ Leasing, Inc., MRB Enterprise Inc. re #1 Complaint. (LDR)
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for David Utykanski to Appear Pro Hac Vice by BNJ Leasing, Inc., MRB Enterprise Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Good Standing Certificate)(Dyal, Jonathan)
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Brent Seitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice by BNJ Leasing, Inc., MRB Enterprise Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Good Standing Certificate)(Dyal, Jonathan)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan C. Sawyers on behalf of BNJ Leasing, Inc., MRB Enterprise Inc. (Sawyers, Bryan)
October 17, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MRB Enterprise Inc. (Dyal, Jonathan)
October 17, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BNJ Leasing, Inc. (Dyal, Jonathan)
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Portabull Fuel Service, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4116609), filed by BNJ Leasing, Inc., MRB Enterprise Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - United States Patent, Patent No.: 10,232,782 B2, #3 Exhibit 2 - Portabull Website, #4 Exhibit 3 - Figures)(LDR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BNJ Leasing, Inc. et al v. Portabull Fuel Service, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MRB Enterprise Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan P. Dyal
Represented By: Brent G. Seitz - PHV
Represented By: David P. Utykanski - PHV
Represented By: Bryan C. Sawyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BNJ Leasing, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan P. Dyal
Represented By: Brent G. Seitz - PHV
Represented By: David P. Utykanski - PHV
Represented By: Bryan C. Sawyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portabull Fuel Service, LLC
Represented By: Patrick H. Zachary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?