Alvarez v. Home Depot et al
Plaintiff: Jhony Gomez Alvarez
Defendant: Home Depot and John and Jane Does 1-10
Case Number: 2:2019cv00182
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael T Parker
Referring Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Filing 8 Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 1/30/2019 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker. Counsel shall dial 1.888.273.3658, code 1055457 to connect to the call. Confidential settlement memoranda are due on or before 1/24/19 (KPM)
November 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael C. Gatling on behalf of Home Depot (Gatling, Michael)
November 18, 2019 Filing 6 State Court Record by Defendant Home Depot Volumes 1 (Peterson, Megan)
November 18, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #2 , #4 , #5 : Attorney is advised to include the judge assignment KS-MTP to the case number on future filed pleadings. DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #2 , #3 : Incorrect event chosen. This document should have been docketed as an Attachment and linked to the #1 Notice of Removal. Court staff has revised docket entry to reflect correct event. DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #5 re Notice: Incorrect event chosen. This document should have been docketed using the event Attachment and linked to the #1 Notice of Removal. Court staff has revised docket entry to reflect correct event. DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #5 re State Court documents: Incorrect event chosen. This document should have been docketed using the event State Court Record. Attorney is directed to refile the State Court documents using the correct event. (CS)
November 15, 2019 Filing 5 ATTACHMENT of Notice List of Parties and Pleadings by Home Depot re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit-State Court Documents)(Peterson, Megan)
November 15, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Home Depot identifying Corporate Parent Home Depot International, Inc. for Home Depot. (Peterson, Megan)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 ATTACHMENT of Notice to State Court by Home Depot re #1 Notice of Removal. (Peterson, Megan)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 ATTACHMENT of Notice of Removal to Plaintiff by Home Depot re #1 Notice of Removal. (Peterson, Megan)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Home Depot from Circuit Court of Forrest County, Mississippi, case number H19-0067. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0538-4139851) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-Affidavit of Counsel, #3 Exhibit A-1-October 17, 2019 Email from Plaintiff's Counsel, #4 Exhibit A-2-Plaintiff's Medical Bill Summary, #5 Exhibit A-3-March 6, 2018 Dr. Gupta Record, #6 Exhibit A-4-Plaintiff's Settlement Demand, #7 Exhibit B-Complaint) (CS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alvarez v. Home Depot et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot
Represented By: Megan S. Peterson
Represented By: Michael C. Gatling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jhony Gomez Alvarez
Represented By: Michael Saltaformaggio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?