Dunn v. Jones County et al
Plaintiff: Ricky Dunn
Defendant: Brennon Chancellor and Jones County
Case Number: 2:2019cv00183
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael T Parker
Referring Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #13 Motion to Stay Case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on January 10, 2020. (js)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Based on Qualified Immunity filed by Brennon Chancellor, #9 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Jones County. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 1/6/2020 (lm)
January 3, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Stay Case by Brennon Chancellor (Allen, William)
January 3, 2020 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Based on Qualified Immunity filed by Brennon Chancellor (Allen, William)
January 3, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Based on Qualified Immunity by Brennon Chancellor (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Justice Court Affidavits, #2 Exhibit B - Justice Court Abstracts)(Allen, William)
January 3, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Jones County (Allen, William)
January 3, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Jones County (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Charging Affidavits, #2 Exhibit B - Justice Court Abstracts)(Allen, William)
December 20, 2019 Rule 16(a) order mailed to Michael V. Ratliff (KPM)
December 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael V. Ratliff on behalf of Ricky Dunn (Ratliff, Michael)
December 6, 2019 Filing 7 Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 1/16/2020 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker. Counsel shall dial 1.888.273.3658, code 1055457 to connect to the call. Confidential settlement memoranda are due on or before 1/10/20. (KPM)
December 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel M. Waide on behalf of Ricky Dunn (Waide, Daniel)
December 3, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) First Amended Complaint by Brennon Chancellor, Jones County (Allen, William)
December 2, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #4 : Scanned document contains blank page(s). PDF documents should be checked for errors before filing. It is not necessary to refile. (LDR)
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 State Court Record by Defendants Brennon Chancellor, Jones County Volumes I (Allen, William)
November 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE (Supplemental) of Removal by Brennon Chancellor, Jones County (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - First Amended Complaint)(Allen, William)
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Brennon Chancellor, Jones County (Allen, William)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Brennon Chancellor, Jones County from Circuit Court of Jones County, MS, case number 2019-12-CV7. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4139931) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(LDR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunn v. Jones County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brennon Chancellor
Represented By: William Robert Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jones County
Represented By: William Robert Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Dunn
Represented By: Corey D. Gibson
Represented By: Daniel M. Waide
Represented By: Michael V. Ratliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?